New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:16-bk-11241
Case Filed:May 02, 2016
Terminated:Jan 17, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Jun 08, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fairway Group Holdings Corp.
2284 12th Avenue
New York, NY 10027
Represented By
Matthew Scott Barr
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Steven J. Reisman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:15 PM EST
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent
830 3rd Avenue, 9th Floor www.primeclerk.com
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Adam M. Adler
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor
JMM Raceway, LLC, Mattone Group Raceway, LLC and Gart Roosevelt Associates, LLC, As Tenants in Common c/o Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C., Attn: Jeffrey C. Chancas, Esq.
377 Broadway, 6th Floor
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Chancas
Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins
contact info
Creditor
Yale & Towne SPE, LLC
Represented By
Raymond H. Lemisch
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
West Side Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin J. Nash
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Natural Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph S. Sheerin
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Ronald M. Tucker
Simon Property Group
contact info
Creditor
Delio Polanco
Raymond Schwartzberg & Associates, PLLC 1412 Broadway Suite 1100A
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Raymond Schwartzberg
Raymond Schwartzberg
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger
contact info
Amish R. Doshi
Doshi Legal Group, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
NYS Department of Tax and Finance
120 Broadway, 24th Fl
New York, NY 10271
Represented By
Paulina Stamatelos
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Manetto Hills Associates 116, LLC
Represented By
Brett D. Goodman
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648
Represented By
Joseph H. Lemkin
Stark & Stark
contact info
Thomas S. Onder
Stark & Stark, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Lake Grove Owners, LLC
Represented By
Laurence May
Eiseman Levine Lehrhaupt & Kakoyiannis
contact info
Creditor
KeHe Distributors LLC
Represented By
Paula K. Jacobi
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Kristen N. Pate 110 North Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Kristen N. Pate
Brookfield Property Reit Inc.
contact info
Jeffrey R. Gleit
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023
Creditor
DFD Development Limited Partnership
Represented By
David M. Bass
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
CyrusOne LLC
Glenn Rogers PLLC 11610 Bee Caves Rd Suite 220
Austin, TX 78738
Represented By
Marvin E. Sprouse
Sprouse Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
AmTrust North America, Inc.
Represented By
Lisa Arlyn Lowe
Buckley King Lpa
contact info
Creditor
Christopher Ranch, LLC and Bounty Fresh, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan S. Bodner
Bodner Law PLLC
contact info
Creditor
GGP Staten Island Mall, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Gleit
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
contact info
Creditor
Astoria Holding Corp.
2181 Ralph Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11234
Represented By
Jonathan S. Pasternak
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Austin Meat Company
Represented By
Neal M. Rosenbloom
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Kevin J. Nash
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ventura in Manhattan, Inc.
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962
Represented By
Mark E. Hall
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Vantiv, LLC
Represented By
Todd Allan Atkinson
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Interested Party
United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Local 1500
Anthony Speelman 425 Merrick Avenue
Westbury, NY 11590
Represented By
Steven Charles Farkas
Colleran, O'Hara & Mills, LLP
contact info
John Stackpole Groarke
Colleran, O'Hara & Mills, LLP
contact info
Michael Dennis Bosso
Colleran, O'Hare & Mills, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Robert Belmonte
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Credit Suisse AG, Cayman Islands Branch
Represented By
William Austin Jowers
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Christopher G. Boies
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Michael C. Rupe
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Stockholder
Howard Glickberg
Represented By
Rocco A. Cavaliere
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Represented By
Greg M. Zipes
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Unknown
Shanna Bailey
Unknown
Alfonso Nina
Represented By
Shanna Bailey
William Ricigliano, P.C.
contact info

Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
239 239 notice Notice, Withdrawal Tue 01/17 4:39 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Lift Stay Related [+] filed by Shanna Bailey. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 238
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 01/17 4:42 PM
Case Closed. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-]