Fairway Greenwich Street LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11241
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11241
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-11251 |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Final Decree signed on 10/11/2016 closing chapter 11 case. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 10/11 3:06 PM
Case Closed. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Bankruptcy Closing Report / Closing Report in Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Matthew Scott Barr on behalf of Fairway Greenwich Street LLC. (Barr, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Application for Final Decree / Motion of Reorganized Debtors for Entry of Final Decree Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 350(a) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022 Closing Reorganized Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Responses due by 9/22/2016, with presentment to be held on 9/29/2016 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). (Barr, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order signed on 5/3/2016 directing joint administration of 16-11241 16-11242 16-11243 16-11244 16-11245 16-11246 16-11247 16-11248 16-11249 16-11250 16-11251 16-11252 16-11253 16-11254 16-11255 16-11256 16-11257 16-11258 16-11259 16-11260 16-11261 16-11262 16-11263 16-11264 16-11265 and 16-11266 under 16-11241 (Fairway Group Holdings Corp., et al). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Matthew Scott Barr on behalf of Fairway Greenwich Street LLC. (Barr, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement / Debtors' Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) and 7007.1 and Local Rule 1007-3 . Filed by Matthew Scott Barr on behalf of Fairway Greenwich Street LLC. (Barr, Matthew) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 05/03 12:03 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11251 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11262624. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Tue 05/03 8:07 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 05/03 12:12 PM
Case Joint Administration. An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Bankruptcy Rules directing the procedural consolidation and jointadministration of the chapter 11 cases of Fairway Group Holdings Corp.; Fairway Group Acquisition Co.; Fairway Bakery LLC; Fairway Broadway LLC; Fairway Chelsea LLC; Fairway Construction Group, LLC; Fairway Douglaston LLC; Fairway East 86th Street LLC; Fairway Ecommerce LLC; Fairway Georgetowne LLC; Fairway Greenwich Street LLC; Fairway Group Central Services LLC; Fairway Group Plainview LLC; Fairway Hudson Yards LLC; Fairway Kips Bay LLC; Fairway Nanuet LLC; Fairway Paramus LLC; Fairway Pelham LLC; Fairway Pelham Wines & 8 Spirits LLC; Fairway Red Hook LLC; Fairway Stamford LLC; Fairway Stamford Wines & Spirits LLC; Fairway Staten Island LLC; Fairway Uptown LLC; Fairway Westbury LLC; and Fairway Woodland Park LLC. The docket in Case No. 16-11241 (MEW)should be consulted for all matters affecting the case. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 05/16/2016. Schedule C due 05/16/2016. Schedule D due 05/16/2016. Schedule E/F due 05/16/2016. Schedule G due 05/16/2016. Schedule H due 05/16/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/16/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/16/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 05/16/2016, Initial Case Conference due by 6/1/2016, Filed by Matthew Scott Barr of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Fairway Greenwich Street LLC. (Barr, Matthew) |