New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lisa G Beckerman
Case #: 1:16-bk-11275
Case Filed:May 04, 2016
Claims Deadline:Jul 25, 2016
Terminated:Mar 20, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Mar 30, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Aeropostale, Inc.
112 West 34th Street 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10120
Represented By
Albert Togut
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Ted Poretz
Zukerman Gore Brandeis & Crossman, LLP
contact info
Garrett A. Fail
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Jacqueline Marcus
Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP
contact info
Ray C Schrock
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Frank A. Oswald
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jun 09, 2017 4:56 PM EDT
Attorney
HAP Property Owner LP
11 Times Sqare
NYC, NY 10026
Represented By
Ted Poretz
Zukerman Gore Brandeis & Crossman, LLP
contact info
Attorney
The Marion Plaza, Inc. dba Eastwood Mall; Governor's Square Company dba Governor's Square Mall; Huntington Mall Company dba Huntington Mall; Kentucky Oaks Mall Company dba Kentucky Oaks Mall
Cafaro Management Company 2445 Belmont Ave. P.O. Box 2186
Youngstown, OH 44504
Represented By
Richard T. Davis
Cafaro Company - Legal Department
contact info
Attorney
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153
Represented By
Garrett A. Fail
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent
830 3rd Avenue, 9th Floor www.primeclerk.com
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Adam M. Adler
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk, LLC
830 Third Ave 9th Fl
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Adam M. Adler
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Warren E. Agin
Swiggart & Agin, LLC 197 Portland Street Fourth Floor
Boston, MA 02114
Represented By
Warren E. Agin
contact info
Creditor
15 W. 34th St. Retail LLC
Represented By
Alyson M. Fiedler
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Creditor
1515 Broadway Fee Owner LLC and SLG 125 Chubb LLC
Represented By
Edmond P. O'Brien
Stempel Bennett Claman & Hochberg, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
1515 Broadway Retail LLC and 474 Fulton Owner LLC
Represented By
Andrew M. Minear
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Arthur Jay Steinberg
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Alyson M. Fiedler
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Creditor
AT&T Corp. and Affliliates
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Michael G. Burke
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Creditor
Aero OpCo, LLC
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
American National Insurance Company
One Moody Plaza
Galveston, TX 77550
Represented By
Tara B. Annweiler
Greer, Herz, & Adams, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Aranov Management
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Arizona Public Service Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Arlington ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, L
contact info
Creditor
Avenue Webb Gin, LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor
BRE RC Las Palmas TX, LP
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bellevue Square, LLC
Nold Muchinsky, PLLC 10500 NE 8th Street Ste. 930
Bellevue, WA 98004
Represented By
David A. Nold
Nold Muchinsky PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Bexar County
Represented By
David G. Aelvoet
Linebarger Goggan Blair Pena & Sampson
contact info
Creditor
Bloomfield Holdings, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Broadway Mall Owner
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Burleson ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, L
contact info
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC (f/k/a Claims Recovery Group LLC)
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Creditor
Cafaro Management Company
Represented By
Richard M. Meth
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cambridgeside Galleria Associates Trust
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP 400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Leslie Ann Berkoff
Moritt, Hock & Hamroff, LLP
contact info
Gina Barbieri O'Neil
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee LLP
contact info
Paul W. Carey
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee,
contact info
Creditor
Carousel Center Company, L.P.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Causeway LLC
Represented By
Fred B. Ringel
Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese &
contact info
Creditor
Cencor Realty Services, Inc.
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Centennial Real Estate Co.
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
CenterCal Properties, LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Certain Texas Taxing Authorities
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder,
contact info
Creditor
Champlain Centre North, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
City Of El Paso
Represented By
David G. Aelvoet
Linebarger Goggan Blair Pena & Sampson
contact info
Creditor
City Of New York
New York City Law Department 100 Church Street 5th Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Gabriela P. Cacuci
N.Y.C. Law Department
contact info
Creditor
City of Garland
1919 S Shiloh Rd, Ste 310, LB 40
Garland, TX 75042
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, L
contact info
Creditor
City of Grapevine, Grapevine-Colleyville ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, L
contact info
Creditor
City of frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Claims Recovery Group LLC
92 Union Avenue 92 Union Ave
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Represented By
Allison R Axenrod
Claims Recovery Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth Edison Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Connecticut Light and Power Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Constellation Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Constellation NewEnergy, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
c/o Belkys Escobar County of Loudoun
One Harrison St. SE, MSC #06
Leesburg, VA 20175
Represented By
Belkys Escobar
Loudoun County, Virginia
contact info
Creditor
Covington Gateway Acquisition, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Crossgates Mall General Company NewCo, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Crowley ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, L
contact info
Creditor
Crystal Run Newco, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
DDR Corp.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Scott Fleischer
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Diligent Corporation f/k/a Diligent Board Member Services, Inc.
1385 Broadway 19th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Curtis M. Plaza
Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland Perretti LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dimond Center Holdings
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Easton Town Center II, LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ector CAD
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78247
Represented By
David G. Aelvoet
Linebarger Goggan Blair Pena & Sampson
contact info
Creditor
EklecCo NewCo LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Excel Odessa LLC
Represented By
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust
Represented By
David L. Pollack
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Florida Power & Light Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Foursquare Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
G&I VI Promenade, LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
G&I VII Retail Carriage LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
GEM Realty Capital
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Kristen N. Pate 110 North Wacker
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Kristen N. Pate
General Growth Properties, Inc.
contact info
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
GS Pacific ER LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Galveston County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Garland ISD
1919 S Shiloh Rd, Ste 310, LB 40
Garland, TX 75042
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott, L
contact info
Creditor
Georgia Power Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Gran Plaza, LP
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Gregg County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Gregory Greenfield & Associates, Ltd.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Scott Fleischer
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hansae Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Stanley B. Tarr
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kim Hawthorne
Law Office of Michael A. Kaufman, P.A. 845 Third Avenue 6th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Michael Aaron Kaufman
Michael A. Kaufman, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Holyoke Mall Company, L.P.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Humble Independent School District
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder,
contact info
Creditor
IREIT Flowood Dogwood, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Infor (US), Inc.
Represented By
Andrew B. Eckstein
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP
contact info
Creditor
Inland Commercial Real Estate Services, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
International Fidelity Insurance Company
Cheisa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC One Boland Drive
West Orange, NJ 07052
Represented By
Scott A. Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Creditor
Irving ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Island Pacific Systems Corporation,
Magnozzi & Kye, LLP 23 Green Stre
Huntington, NY 11743
Represented By
Amish R. Doshi
Magnozzi & Kye
contact info
Creditor
JPMCCM 2001-CIBC2 Collin Creek Mall, LLC
Represented By
Michael V. Blumenthal
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Bruce J. Zabarauskas
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
JPMG Manassas Mall Owner LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jersey Central Power & Light Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Judson ISD
Represented By
David G. Aelvoet
Linebarger Goggan Blair Pena & Sampson
contact info
Creditor
KRE Colonie Owner, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Krausz Companies
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Kravco Company
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
LIT-Northend, LLC
Attn: Howard C. Rubin 2100 Ross Ave., Ste. 750
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Howard C. Rubin
Kessler Collins, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Las Palmas RioCan LP
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Li & Fung Limited
Represented By
Adam C. Rogoff
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Robert T. Schmidt
Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Liquidity Solutions, Inc.
Liquidity Solutions, Inc. 1 University Plaza, Suite 312
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Creditor
Louisiana Department of Revenue
Bakruptcy Counsel, Collection Division 617 N. Third Street, Office 780 P.O. Box 66658 (Zip Code 70896-6658)
Baton Rouge, LA 70802
Represented By
Florence Bonaccorso-Saenz
Louisiana Department Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Lubbock Central Appraisal District
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott P.O. Box 817
Lubbock, TX 79408
Represented By
Laura J. Monroe
Perdue,brandon, Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Mall 1 Bay Plaza, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Wurst
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Metripolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Nancy Isaacson
Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Metropolis Lifestyle Center, LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Metropolitan Edison Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Miami-Dade County Tax Collector
Miami-Dade Bankruptcy Unit Alexis R. Gonzalez 200 N. W. 2nd Avenue
Miami, FL 33128
Represented By
Ileana Cruz
Office Of The County Attorney
contact info
Creditor
Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Licensing, GP and Microsoft Online, Inc.
Riddell Williams P.S. 1001 4th Ave Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154
Represented By
Joseph E. Shickich, Jr.
Riddell Williams P.S.
contact info
Creditor
Missouri department of revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475 301 W High St.
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Steven A. Ginther
Missouri Department Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Monongahela Power Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Montgomery County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
NYS Departmen tof Taxation and Finance
Represented By
Enid Nagler Stuart
New York State Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
New Westgate Mall LLC
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP 400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Leslie Ann Berkoff
Moritt, Hock & Hamroff, LLP
contact info
Gina Barbieri O'Neil
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee LLP
contact info
Paul W. Carey
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee,
contact info
Creditor
North Riverside Park Associates LLC
Represented By
Fred B. Ringel
Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese &
contact info
Creditor
Office Depot, Inc.
Shraiberg, Ferrara, Landau & Page, P.A. 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 300
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
Bradley S. Shraiberg
Shraiberg, Ferrara & Landau, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Ohio Edison Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Amish R. Doshi
Magnozzi & Kye
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Creditor
Orlando Utilities Commission
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
PAC Operating Limited Partnership
Represented By
Marita S. Erbeck
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Creditor
PGIM Real Estate
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
PREIT Services, LLC and PREIT-Rubin, Inc.
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street, Suite 300
Philadelphia, PA 19147
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
Pennsylvania Electric Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Pennsylvania Power Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Plaza Las Americas, Inc.
Attn: James H. Rollins 1180 West Peachtree St. Suite 1800
Atlanta, GA 30309
Represented By
Arthur E. Rosenberg
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
James H. Rollins
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Potomac Edison Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Poughkeepsie Galleria LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Public Service Company of New Hampshire
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Pyramid Walden Company, L.P.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
R.R Donnelley & Sons Company
Represented By
Robert M. Hirsh
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Creditor
Radial, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew B. Eckstein
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ramco-Gershenson Properties, L.P.
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Retailer Flooring Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
David H. Ealy
Shapiro,rosenbaum,liebschultz & Nelson
contact info
Creditor
Riverwalk Marketplace (New Orleans), LLC
Spector & Johnson, PLLC 12770 Coit Road, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75251
Represented By
Howard Marc Spector
Spector & Johnson, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Rouse Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Scott Fleischer
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
Creditor
ST Mall Owner LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Salmon Run Shopping Center, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
San Diego Gas & Electric Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Sangertown Square, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Kevin Michael Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Saucon Valley Lifestyle Center, L.P.
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Shops at Sunset Owner, LLC
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Simon Property Group, LLP
Represented By
Ronald M. Tucker
Simon Property Group
contact info
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
Smith County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Southgate Mall Associates, LLP
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury
Cadillac Place 3030 W Grand Blvd. Suite 10-200
Detroit, MI 48202
Represented By
Juandisha Harris
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Taubman Landlords
Andrew S Conway 200 E Long Lake Road Suite 300
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Represented By
Andrew S. Conway
The Taubman Company
contact info
Creditor
Tealium, Inc.
401 West A Street Suite 2600
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Mary R. Robberson
Higgs Fletcher & Mack LLP
contact info
Michael J. Catalfimo
Carter, Conboy, Et Al.
contact info
Martin A. Eliopulos
Higgs Fletcher & Mack LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tennessee Department Of Revenue
Represented By
Marvin E. Clements, Jr.
Office Of The Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Texas Ad Valorem Taxing Jurisdictions
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Leon B Gordon
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Joshua S. Bauchner
Ansell Grimm & Aaron
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By
Rachel R Obaldo
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
The Cleveland Electric Illuminating Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
The Forbes Company
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
The Krausz Companies
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
The Macerich Company
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Mall at Bay Plaza
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, PC J. Wurst 1425 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556
Represented By
Michael S. Amato
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey A. Wurst
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Titanium Marketing, Inc.
425 Fifth Avenue Suite 601
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Douglas J. Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Creditor
Toledo Edison Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
c/o Kay D. Brock Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767
Represented By
Kay Diebel Brock
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Tucson Electric Power Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Turnberry Associates
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Scott Fleischer
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee
Represented By
Alan Morris Feld
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Creditor
UBS Realty Investors LLC
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
UNS Electric, Inc.
Creditor
USNE Electric, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
UrbanCal Oakland Mall, LLC
Represented By
David M. Blau
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Creditor
VNO 100 West 33rd Street, LLC
Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP 270 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Samuel Stewart Smith
Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP
contact info
Brad Eric Scheler
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson
contact info
Creditor
Vestar Orchard Town Center, L.L.C.
Represented By
William Novotny
Dickinson Wright/mariscal Weeks
contact info
David M. Blau
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Village at Sandhill, LLC
Represented By
Kristin D. Ogburn
Horack Talley Pharr & Lowndes
contact info
Creditor
Vintage Capital Group
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Vintage Real Estate LLC
Represented By
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor
WO Owner LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Creditor
WP Glimcher Inc.
Represented By
Edward M. King
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Ronald Eric Gold
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Alan D. Halperin
Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Warwick Mall L.L.C.
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Goulston & Storrs, PC
contact info
Creditor
Warwick Mall OP L.L.C.
Represented By
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Vanessa P. Moody
Goulston & Storrs, PC
contact info
Creditor
Washington Prime Group Inc. f/k/a WP Glimcher Inc.
Creditor
Webb Gin Property (SUB) LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor
West Penn Power Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Western Massachusetts Electric Company
Represented By
Michael Kwiatkowski
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Westfield, LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive Ninth Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Creditor
Melissa Sue Wilson
21391 E. Courtyard Lane
Liberty Lake, WA 99019
Represented By
Nikalous O Armitage
Layman Law Firm, Pllp
contact info
Creditor
YTC Mall Owner, LLC
Represented By
Dustin Parker Branch
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Platinum Credit Management, L.P.
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
Ballard Spahr, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Maria A. Bove
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Bradford J. Sandler
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Robert J. Feinstein
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
John A. Morris
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones
contact info
Financial Advisor
FTI CONSULTING, INC
Financial Advisor
Province Inc.
Represented By
Maria A. Bove
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Interested Party
A contractual joint venture composed of Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC and Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC
Represented By
G. Alexander Bongartz
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Interested Party
ABG-Aero IpCo, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Egan
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
ABG-Aero, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Egan
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
Aero OpCo LLC
Represented By
Brian S. Hermann
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton &
contact info
Interested Party
Alameda Produce Market, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra S. Kelly
Liner LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Apparel FZCO
Interested Party
Aria Partners, G.P.
Interested Party
Authentic Brands Group, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Egan
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
CAPREF Brookwood Village LLC
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962
Represented By
Mark E. Hall
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CAPREF Burbank LLC
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962
Represented By
Mark E. Hall
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CAPREF Lloyd II LLC
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962
Represented By
Mark E. Hall
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Cord Meyer Development LLC
Represented By
Patrick Collins
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Veronique Anne Urban
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
ESRT 112 West 34th Street, L.P.
Represented By
William Heuer
Westerman Ball Ederer Miller Zucker
contact info
Interested Party
Montreal PTE, Ltd.
Interested Party
Primestor CFIC/CG LLC
Represented By
Evan J. Zucker
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Simon Aero, LLC
Represented By
Brian S. Hermann
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton &
contact info
Interested Party
Simon Property Group, L.P.
Represented By
Brian S. Hermann
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton &
contact info
Interested Party
Stores Specialists, Inc.
Represented By
Pedro A. Jimenez
Jones Day
contact info
Interested Party
TOTE Maritime Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By
Rick Aaron Steinberg
Price Meese Shulman & D'Arminio, P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
Crystal Financial LLC
Represented By
Scott K. Rutsky
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Jared D. Zajac
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Deloitte Tax LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112
Other Prof.
Ernst & Young LLP
Represented By
John W. Weiss
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
One Penn Plaza, Suite 3335
New York, NY 10119
Represented By
Albert Togut
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Stockholder
Grady Travis Tadlock, III
202 Laverne Terrace
Georgetown, TX 78628
Represented By
Areya Holder Aurzada
Holder Law
contact info
Transferee
Daniel Hans
932 Hillside Ave
New Hyde Park, NY 11040
Represented By
Daniel Alan Hans
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Represented By
Brian Shoichi Masumoto
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Unknown
474 Fulton Owner LLC
Represented By
Alyson M. Fiedler
Schiff Hardin LLP
contact info
Unknown
5060 Montclair Plaza Lane Owner, LLC
Goodkin & Lynch LLP 1875 Century Park East Suite 1860
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Michael Abtin Shakouri
Goodkin & Lynch LLP
contact info
Unknown
AERO Investors et al
Represented By
Robert Britton
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Unknown
Aero Investors LLC
Represented By
Robert Britton
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Unknown
Areya Aurzada
Unknown
Bethany Mota Global LLC
Represented By
David W. Dykhouse
Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Jackson Taylor Kirklin
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Unknown
Borough of South River
Represented By
Michael S. Nagurka
contact info
Unknown
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600
Clayton, MO 63105
Represented By
Marshall C. Turner
Husch & Eppenberger, LLC
contact info
Unknown
Champion Energy Services, LLC
Represented By
Casey B. Howard
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Unknown
Frederick J. Meno, as Receiver of Vista Rige Mall
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Unknown
Jones Lang LaSalle Americas Inc.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Scott Fleischer
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
contact info
Unknown
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
Unknown
Lakeforest Owner LLC
111 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Casey B. Howard
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Unknown
Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Represented By
Casey B. Howard
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Unknown
MGF Sourcing Holdings, Limited
Represented By
Robert Britton
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Unknown
Bethany Mota
Represented By
David W. Dykhouse
Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Jackson Taylor Kirklin
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Unknown
Sae-A Trading Co., Ltd.
865 South Figueroa Street, 24th Floor Attention: Steven Polard
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Hugh R. McCullough
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Steven G. Polard
Eisner Jaffe
contact info
Steven Polard
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Unknown
Securities And Exchange Commission
New York Regional Office Brookfield Place 200 Vesey St. Suite 400
New York, NY 10281
Represented By
Neal R. Jacobson
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Unknown
Tiger Capital Group, LLC & Great American Group, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Malfitano
Joseph A. Malfitano, PLLC
contact info
Unknown
Urban Edge Properties
Represented By
Elyssa Suzanne Kates
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Unknown
Zona Rosa Development, LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 26 2016
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION UNDER SEAL: Memorandum Of Decision Signed On 8/25/2016, Regarding Debtor's Motion For An Order (I) Disqualifying Sycamore Partners And Its Affiliates From Credit Bidding; (2) Equitably Subordinating Claims; And (3) Recharacterizing Claim. (related document(s)496) (Ebanks, Liza) Modified on 8/26/2016 (Richards, Beverly). Modified on 12/19/2017 (Wilson, Timothy).
GPO Aug 26 2016
[PUBLIC VERSION] MEMORANDUM OF DECISION UNDER SEAL: Memorandum Of Decision Signed On 8/26/2016, Regarding Debtor's Motion For An Order (I) Disqualifying Sycamore Partners And Its Affiliates From Credit Bidding; (2) Equitably Subordinating Claims; And (3) Recharacterizing Claim. (related document(s) 496 , 723 ) (Ebanks, Liza) Modified on 8/26/2016 (Richards, Beverly).
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
2259 2259 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Tue 03/21 4:29 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/01/2023 Filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of ARO Liquidation, Inc.. (Ortiz, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 03/20 2:48 PM
Case Closed. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]