Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11275

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lisa G Beckerman
Case #: 1:16-bk-11285
Case Filed:May 04, 2016
Terminated:Mar 20, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Aeropostale Holdings, Inc.
112 W 34th St Fl 22
New York, NY 10120-2400
Represented By
Ray C Schrock
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Monday, March 20, 2023
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 03/20 3:04 PM
Case Closed. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Wed 03/01 1:16 PM
Order Signed On 3/1/2023 Re: Granting Final Decrees Closing The Chapter 11 Cases Of The Debtors (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 09/15 12:14 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 09/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Monday, September 12, 2022
9 9 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 09/12 1:25 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Sean H. Lane to Judge Lisa G Beckerman. Judge Lisa G Beckerman added to the case. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
8 8 order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Thu 06/29 3:08 PM
Order signed on 6/29/2017 Granting Motion Authorizing and Directing Debtors to Change Their Corporate Names and Granting Related Relief. (Bush, Brent)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2016
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Mon 10/17 12:02 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (In Re: Schedules) (Bush, Brent)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 18, 2016
7 7 27 pgs misc Schedules Sat 06/18 12:36 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual / Schedule of Assets and Liabilities for Aeropostale Holdings, Inc. (Case No. 16-11285 Filed by Garrett A. Fail on behalf of Aeropostale Holdings, Inc.. (Fail, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2016
6 6 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Fri 06/17 10:08 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual / Statement of Financial Affairs for Aeropostale Holdings, Inc. (Case No. 16-11285 Filed by Garrett A. Fail on behalf of Aeropostale Holdings, Inc.. (Fail, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2016
misc Add Party Fri 05/06 11:09 AM
Prime Clerk LLC, Claims Agent added to the case. (Bush, Brent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2016
5 5 6 pgs order Motion, Joint Administration Thu 05/05 11:11 AM
Order signed on 5/4/2016 Granting Motion for Joint Administration. All Entries Shall be Made in Lead Case No. 16-11275 Related [+] (Bush, Brent)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
4 4 ans Declaration Wed 05/04 2:30 AM
Declaration of David J. Dick Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the Southern District of New York Related [+] filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Aeropostale Holdings, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 motion Motion, Joint Administration Wed 05/04 1:26 AM
Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors' Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) For Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Aeropostale Holdings, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 05/04 1:10 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement / Debtors' Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) and 7007.1 and Local Rule 1007-3 . Related [+] Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Aeropostale Holdings, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 17 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 05/04 12:39 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 05/18/2016. Schedule C due 05/18/2016. Schedule D due 05/18/2016. Schedule E/F due 05/18/2016. Schedule G due 05/18/2016. Schedule H due 05/18/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/18/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/18/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 05/18/2016, Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/1/2016, Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2016, Initial Case Conference due by 6/3/2016, Filed by Ray C Schrock of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Aeropostale Holdings, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 05/04 12:43 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11285 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11265109. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Wed 05/04 7:58 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]