Kasolas v. Digi-Key Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-03047 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Digi-Key Corporation
701 Brooks Avenue South
Thief River Falls, MN 56701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kasolas, Trustee of the Hashfast Creditor Trust
Baker & Hostetler LLP 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/12 9:49 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:16-ap-3047. (wbk) |
||
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Dropped
Fri 08/26 2:38 PM
Hearing Dropped. The status conference is taken off calendar. A Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was filed on 8/25/16. (lp ) |
||
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/25 6:44 PM
Certificate of Service Amended Proof of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas (Delaney, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/25 4:46 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (Delaney, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 07/29 2:49 PM
Hearing held and continued Hearing scheduled for 08/26/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 05/23 5:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Digi-Key Corporation 5/17/2016 . (McDow, Ashley) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/12 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 05/12/2016. (Admin.) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/12 11:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-03047 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26291610, amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Discovery
Tue 05/10 3:54 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (gh) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 05/10 3:53 PM
Summons Issued on Digi-Key Corporation Answer Due 6/9/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 7/29/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (gh) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/09 9:50 PM
Adversary case[LINK 16-03047 . 12 , 14 Complaint by Michael Kasolas against Digi-Key Corporation. Fee Amount $350. (McDow, Ashley) |