Hashfast Technologies LLC
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:14-bk-30725 |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 12, 2014 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 06, 2014 |
Converted: | Jun 04, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 25, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hashfast Technologies LLC
649 Mission St Fl 5
San Francisco, CA 94105-4128 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Baker & Hostetler, LLP 16100 Wilshire Blvd. 14th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Koi Systems
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
UBE Enterprises
7425 Creek Rd.
Sandy, UT 84093 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Timothy Lam
6156 Temple City Blvd.
Temple City, CA 91780 |
|
Petitioning Creditor
Edward Hammond
3103 Powell Cir.
Austin, TX 78704 |
|
Petitioning Creditor
Grant Pederson
12538 Botanical Ln.
Frisco, TX 75035 |
|
Responsible Ind
Monica Hushen
|
|
Responsible Ind
Peter S. Kravitz
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Office of the U.S. Trustee 235 Pine St Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
1. | HashFast Hit with Involuntary Bankruptcy Petition (coinreport.net) |
Submitted Wed 05/14/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |