Kasolas v. Hendrickson
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-03048 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Peter Hendrickson
773 East El Camino Real, #142
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kasolas, Trustee of the Hashfast Creditor Trust
Baker & Hostetler LLP 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/19 10:00 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:16-ap-3048. (wbk) |
||
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Fri 08/05 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 08/05/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 08/03 2:54 PM
Order of Dismissal Upon Settlement of Adversary Proceeding . (dmf) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Bk)
Fri 07/29 2:50 PM
Hearing Held. The court will issue a dismissal order. (lp ) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 05/23 5:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Peter Hendrickson 5/17/2016 . (McDow, Ashley) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/12 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 05/12/2016. (Admin.) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/12 11:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-03048 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26291610, amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Discovery
Tue 05/10 4:09 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (gh) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 05/10 4:08 PM
Summons Issued on Peter Hendrickson Answer Due 6/9/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 7/29/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (gh) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/09 9:55 PM
Adversary case[LINK 16-03048 . 12 , 14 Complaint by Michael Kasolas against Peter Hendrickson. Fee Amount $350. (McDow, Ashley) |