Kasolas v. Bishop
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-03049 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Christopher Bishop
4701 San Leandro St., Apt. 1G
Oakland, CA 94601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kasolas, Trustee of the Hashfast Creditor
Baker & Hostetler LLP 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 09/29 3:13 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:16-ap-3049. (dmf) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/28 2:59 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (Delaney, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Fri 08/26 2:38 PM
Hearing Held. The status conference is taken off calendar. (lp ) |
||
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
Alias Summons Issued
Fri 07/29 2:54 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Christopher Bishop Date Issued 7/29/2016, Answer Due 8/29/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 8/26/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (dmf) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 07/29 2:56 PM
Hearing held and continued. The clerk will issue an alias summons setting a status conference for 8/26/16 at 1:30 p.m. Hearing scheduled for 08/26/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
cmp
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued
Thu 07/28 2:06 PM
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued on Christopher Bishop. Reason: alternate address. (McDow, Ashley) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 05/23 5:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on Christopher Bishop 5/17/2016 . (McDow, Ashley) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/12 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 05/12/2016. (Admin.) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/12 11:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-03049 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26291610, amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Discovery
Tue 05/10 4:20 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (gh) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 05/10 4:19 PM
Summons Issued on Christopher Bishop Answer Due 6/9/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 7/29/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (gh) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/09 10:02 PM
Adversary case[LINK 16-03049 . 12 , 14 Complaint by Michael Kasolas against Christopher Bishop. Fee Amount $350. (McDow, Ashley) |