Kasolas v. Woodward
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-03052 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Amy Woodward
57 Oakwood St.
San Francisco, CA 94110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kasolas, Trustee of the Hashfast Creditor Trust
Baker & Hostetler LLP 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Sunday, December 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Sun 12/18 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 12/18/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Fri 12/16 2:19 PM
Order of Dismissal Upon Settlement of Adversary Proceeding . (dmf) Modified on 12/16/2016 ERROR: Order was entered in error, per Judge Montali (dc) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 09/30 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 09/30/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation
Wed 09/28 11:47 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice . (dmf) |
|
court
Hearing Dropped
Wed 09/28 10:43 AM
Hearing Dropped. The status conference on 9/30/16 at 1:30 p.m. is taken off calendar per the Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed on 9/27/16 (dkt #9). (lp ) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/28 11:48 AM
Adversary Case Closed 16-03052 (dmf) |
||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Tue 09/27 5:28 PM
Notice Regarding Notice of Errata Re Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding without Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (Delaney, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
stip
Dismiss
Tue 09/27 3:29 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (Delaney, Michael) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
order
Judge Docket Order
Mon 09/26 11:38 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) Plaintiff did not give notice of the September 30, 2016, 1:30 PM continued status conference as instructed at the August 26, 2016, status conference. Unless this adversary proceeding has been settled, the court will not continue the September 30, 2016, 1:30 PM status conference. Instead, it will dismiss for lack of prosecution unless plaintiff shows good cause why this matter should be set for trial. (Montali, Dennis) |
||
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 08/26 11:58 AM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (Delaney, Michael) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 08/26 2:40 PM
Hearing held and continued. No appearance was made by the defendant. The status conference is continued to 9/30/16. Counsel for plaintiff to give notice of the continued hearing. If the matter is settled, the continued status conference will be taken off the calendar. Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Conference Statement
Wed 08/24 2:05 PM
Status Statement. . Filed by Defendant Amy Woodward (gh) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 07/29 2:08 PM
Hearing held and continued. Pro se defendant appeared at the status conference. Hearing scheduled for 08/26/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp ) |
||
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/29 12:38 PM
Answer to Complaint, Filed by Amy Woodward. (dc) |
|
cmp
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued
Thu 07/28 2:07 PM
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued on Amy Woodward. Reason: alternate address. (McDow, Ashley) |
||
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 05/23 5:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on Amy Woodward 5/17/2016 . (McDow, Ashley) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 05/13 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 05/13/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/12 11:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-03052 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26291610, amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Discovery
Wed 05/11 8:51 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (gh) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/11 8:50 AM
Summons Issued on Amy Woodward Answer Due 6/10/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 7/29/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (gh) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/09 10:22 PM
Adversary case[LINK 16-03052 . 12 , 14 Complaint by Michael Kasolas against Amy Woodward. Fee Amount $350. (McDow, Ashley) |