Kasolas v. Cheaney
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-30725
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-03053 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Avram S. Cheaney
1305 Laguna Street, #4
San Francisco, CA 94115 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kasolas, Trustee of the Hashfast Creditor Trust
Baker & Hostetler LLP 11601 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/19 3:47 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:16-ap-3053. (dc) |
||
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kasolas. (McDow, Ashley) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 05/13/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/12 11:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-03053 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 26291610, amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (gh) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Avram Cheaney Answer Due 6/10/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 7/29/2016 at 01:30 PM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (gh) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 16-03053 . 12 , 14 Complaint by Michael Kasolas against Avram S. Cheaney. Fee Amount $350. (McDow, Ashley) |