Penn Virginia MC Operating Company L.L.C.
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:16-bk-32395
Lead case is: 3:16-bk-32395
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-32399 |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Penn Virginia MC Operating Company L.L.C.
840 Gessner Rd Ste 800
Houston, TX 77024-4147 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Suite 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Case Closed - Chapter 11
Thu 02/01 10:38 AM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Cummings, James) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Fri 05/27 12:00 AM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia MC Operating Company L.L.C.. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Thu 05/26 11:59 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Schedules of Assets and Liabilities filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia MC Operating Company L.L.C.. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Joint Administration
Fri 05/13 3:04 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration , Related Case 3:16-bk-32395. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Penn Virginia Corporation, Case No. 16-32395 Penn Virginia Holding Corp., Case No. 16-32396 Penn Virginia MC Corporation, Case No. 16-32397 Penn Virginia MC Energy L.L.C., Case No. 16-32398 Penn Virginia MC Operating Company L.L.C., Case No. 16-32399 Penn Virginia Oil & Gas Corporation, Case No. 16-32400 Penn Virginia Oil & Gas GP LLC, Case No. 16-32401 Penn Virginia Oil & Gas LP LLC, Case No. 16-32402 and Penn Virginia Oil & Gas, L.P., Case No. 16-32403 The docket in Case No. 16-32395 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Cummings, James) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing held
Fri 05/13 12:20 PM
Hearing held;Motion GRANTED; Lead Case 16-32395 Appearance(s): Michael Condyles . (Rintye, Peggy) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 05/12 2:03 AM
Motion for Joint Administration with 16-32395 16-32396 16-32397 16-32398 16-32400 16-32401 16-32402 16-32403 and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia MC Operating Company L.L.C.. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/12 1:05 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 16-32399 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24000563, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Thu 05/12 1:04 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia MC Operating Company L.L.C.. (Condyles, Michael) |