Penn Virginia Corporation
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-32395 |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Penn Virginia Corporation
14701 St. Mary's Lane, Suite 275
Houston, TX 77079 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
R. Seth Bullock
Four Radnor Corporate Center, Suite 200 100 Matsonford Road
Radnor, PA 19087 |
|
Debtor
R. Seth Bullock, Authorized Signatory
Four Radnor Corporate Center, Suite 200 100 Matsonford Road
Radnor, PA 19087 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:53 PM EST |
Creditor
Marathon Oil EF LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Petroleum Development Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Patterson-UTI Drilling Company LLC
Baker Hostetler LLP 1050 Connecticut Ave. NW Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S. Kerr, Room 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Office of Unumployment Compensation Tax Services (UCTS)
Department of Labor and Industry Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Collections Support Unit 651 Boas Street, Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121 |
|
Creditor
Nueces County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Oilwell Varco, L.P.
Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP 700 Louisiana Street, Suite 4100
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morris CAD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Marubeni Eagle Ford LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Radnor Center Associates
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gaylord A Lawless, Jr.
PO Box 298
Scottsville, TX 75688 |
|
Creditor
Lavaca County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hunt Oil Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harrison County and Harrison CAD
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joan Hagan
|
|
Creditor
H & A Construction, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gonzales County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Don Stecker 711 Navarro Street Ste 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of Louisiana, Dept. of Natural Resources, OMR
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yoakum ISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WesternGeco, LLC
James R. Schroll 2300 Wilson Boulevard 7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weatherford Artificial Lift Systems, LLC
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP 2021 McKinney Avenue Suite 1600
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tenor Capital Management L.P.
|
|
Creditor
Clay A. Sullivan
|
|
Creditor
Gregg County
Gregg County Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Richard Stevens Smylie
|
|
Creditor
Silver Eagle Environmental Solutions, LLC.
191 Beechcracft Lane
Seguin, TX 78155 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
John A. H. Shober
179 Hillcrest Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19118 |
|
Creditor
Sheldon Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Seitel Data, Ltd.
Sands Anderson PC P. O. Box 1998
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roman J. Koropey, Ltd Profit Sharing Plan
|
|
Creditor
Republic Midstream, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Beatrice Redwine-Devries
2201 Libbie Avenue, Ste. 200
Richmond, VA 23230 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chemeketa Community College Foundation
|
|
Creditor
Nolan J. Darilek
7910 Gault Street No. 108
Austin, TX 78757 |
|
Creditor
Johanna L. Darilek
7404 Panola Street
New Orleans, LA 70118 |
|
Creditor
Faith Darilek
2478 FM 533
Shiner, TX 77984 |
|
Creditor
GCT Interests LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CyrusOne, LLC
Glenn Rogers PLLC 11610 Bee Caves Rd Suite 220
Austin, TX 78738 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ConocoPhillips
|
|
Creditor
Alfred Chumchal
209 South Avenue E
Shiner, TX 77984 |
|
Creditor
Excalibur Rentals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Capital One, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CWR Management, LLC dba Clear Water Resources
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Beckville ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Virgie K Barta
209 South Avenue E
Shiner, TX 77984 |
|
Creditor
Bank of Nova Scotia
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Geoffrey Lindgren Bancroft
|
|
Creditor
American Midstream (Lavaca), LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
A2D Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alfredo De La Garza
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dominion Transmission, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
EOG Resources, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elite Toilet Rental, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Enable Gas Gathering, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Enable Gathering & Processing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ronald Darilek
2478 FM 533
Shiner, TX 77984 |
|
Creditor
Enable Midstream Partners, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Enable Products, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Unsecured Claimholders Committee
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Security Holders of Penn Virginia Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Committee of Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Frank Nunez
5525 Kathy Drive
Titusville, FL 32780 |
|
Interested Party
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
|
|
Professional
Augustus Charles Epps, Jr.
909 East Main Street Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Suite 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Roman J. Koropey
14 S. Bryn Mawr Avenue, Suite 210
Bryn Mawr, PA 19010 |
1. | Penn Virginia Corp. emerges from Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Wed 09/14/2016 | |
2. | Penn Virginia Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy due to low oil prices (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/12/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |