Dex Media East, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11200
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11200
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin Gross |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-11201 |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Dex Media East, Inc.
PO Box 619810
2200 West Airfield Drive Dfw Airport, TX 75261-9810 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 12/22/2016 (SH) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/22 1:38 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH) |
||
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Dex Media East, Inc. 16-11201 Filed by Dex Media East, Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Dex Media East, Inc. 16-11201 Filed by Dex Media East, Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order (I)Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II)Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Dex Media, Inc., Case NO 16-11200 Dex Media East, Inc., Case No 16-11201 Dex Media Holdings, Inc., Case No. 16-11202 Dex Media Service LLC, Case No. 16-11203 Dex Media West, Inc., Case No 16-11204 Dex One Digital, Inc., Case No. 16-11205 Dex One Service, Inc., Case No. 16-11206 R.H. Donnelley APIL, Inc., Case No. 16-11207 R.H. Donnelley Corporation, Case No. 16-11208 R.H. Donnelley Inc., Case No. 16-11209 SuperMedia Inc., Case No. 16-11210 SuperMedia LLC, Case No. 16-11211 and SuperMedia Sales Inc., Case No. 16-11212 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 16-11200 (KG). Order Signed on 5/18/2016 (SH) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 05/17 9:07 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (BA) |
||
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/16 10:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11201 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8018190, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Dex Media East, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) |