Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:16-bk-11200
Case Filed:May 16, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jun 14, 2016
Claims Deadline:Jul 07, 2016
Terminated:Jan 18, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Jul 15, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Dex Media, Inc.
2200 West Airfield Drive P.O.Box 619810
DFW Airport, TX 75261
Represented By
Kuan Huang
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
James H.M. Sprayregen
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Nate Taylor
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Kuangyan Huang
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Marc Kieselstein
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Steven K. Kortanek
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Eric F. Leon
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
David L. Pollack
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Ryan Matthew Hehner
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Pauline K. Morgan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Adam Craig Paul
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Liliya Gritsenko
C/o Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
W. Benjamin Winger
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Travis M. Bayer
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Bradley Thomas Giordano
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 12:19 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter Nemer, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Robert Rutty
Represented By
Christopher M. Samis
Whiteford Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Creditor
Roman Romero
1001 5th Street NW
Albuquerque, NM 87102
Creditor
Qwest Dex Holding, Inc.
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Qwest Corporation d/b/a CenturyLink QC
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Qwest Communications International, Inc.
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Prince Georges County, Maryland
6801 Kenilworth Avenue, Suite 400
Riverdale Park, MD 20737
Represented By
Michael Evan Meyers
C/o Meyers, Rodbell & Rosenbaum, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Pinellas County Tax Collector
PO Box 4006
Seminole, FL 33775
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office of the Chief Counsel 1200 K Street, N.W., Suite 340
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Kelly R. Cusick
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
contact info
Creditor
Orchard & Greenwood, LLC
1801 California Street Suite 2600
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Caroline C Fuller
Fairfield And Woods, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
St. John Properties, Inc.
Suite 700, Nottingham Centre 502 Washington Avenue
Towson, MD 21204
Represented By
Robert Lee Hanley, Jr.
Nolan Plumhoff & Williams
contact info
Creditor
New York State Department of Labor
Unemployment Insurance Division Building 12, Room 256
Albany, NY 12240
Creditor
New Mexico Taxation and Revenue Department
Creditor
United Telephone Company of the West d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Weston CA I, LLC
P. O. Box 18237
Raleigh, NC 27619
Represented By
Kevin L. Sink
Nicholls & Crampton, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Mobivity, Inc.
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Steven A. Ginther
Missouri Dept. Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Sebastian Miralles
Represented By
Christopher M. Samis
Whiteford Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Creditor
Jennifer Marshall-Booth
POB 224
Canton, TX 75103
Creditor
United Telephone - Southeast, Inc. d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of the Northwest d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of the Carolinas LLC d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of Texas, Inc. d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of Southcentral Kansas d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of Ohio d/b/a Centurylink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of New Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Centurylink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of Kansas d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of Indiana, Inc. d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Telephone Company of Eastern Kansas d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Savvis Communications Corporation d/b/a CenturyLink TS
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
The United Telephone Company of Pennsylvania LLC d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Robert Magee Vineyard 2004 Trust
Represented By
Kimberly A. Brown
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Richard Scott Cobb
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Edward L. Schnitzer
Ckr Law LLP
contact info
Steven J. Mandelsberg
Hahn & Hessen LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Schwartz
Hahn & Hessen LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By
Stephanie Wickouski
Bryan Cave
contact info
Michelle McMahon
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By
Courtney J Hull
C/o Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Tata America International Corporation
101 Park Ave. 26th Fl.
New York, NY 10178
Represented By
James S. Carr
Kelley Drye & Warren
contact info
Kristin S. Elliott
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Stony Brook Associates LLC
Represented By
Christine E. Devine
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Louge
contact info
Kate P. Foley
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee
contact info
Creditor
Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Licensing, GP
Riddell Williams P.S. 1001 - 4th Avenue Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154
Represented By
Jami B. Nimeroff
Brown Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
Joseph Emil Shickich, Jr.
Riddell Williams P.S.
contact info
Creditor
Central Telephone Company of North Carolina d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Office of the Attorney General c/o Christopher R. Momjian 21 S. 12th Street, 3rd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Represented By
Chris Momjian
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Claims Recovery Group LLC
92 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Creditor
City of Grapevine
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Lorren Chandler
936 Ruth Way
Dover, DE 19904
Creditor
CenturyLink, Inc.
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Mitchell W. Katz
Legal Dept., Centurylink
contact info
Creditor
CenturyLink Communications, LLC f/k/a Qwest Communications Company, LLC d/b/a CenturyLink QCC
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Central Telephone Company of Texas d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Yahoo! Inc.
Bialson, Bergen & Schwab PC 2600 El Camino Real Suite 300
Palo Alto, CA 94306
Represented By
Thomas M. Gaa
Bialson Bergen & Schwab
contact info
Creditor
Central Telephone Company d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bridge Office Building SLC, L.P.
Represented By
Matthew Summers
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David L. Pollack
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ben S. Branch
245 Riverside Ave Suite 00
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Creditor
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
AT&T Intellectual Property LLC and its Affiliates
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Dennis Y. 6-Kao
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Creditor
AR North Loop, LLC
Represented By
Jamie Lynne Edmonson
Venable LLP
contact info
Keith C. Owens
Venable LLP
contact info
Creditor
Yellow Pages Photos, Inc.
Represented By
Kathleen M. Miller
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Creditor
Embarq Corporation
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Martino Lorenzon
Represented By
Christopher M. Samis
Whiteford Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Creditor
Embarq Directory Trademark Company
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Embarq Florida, Inc. d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Irving ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Embarq Minnesota, Inc. d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Embarq Missouri, Inc. d/b/a CenturyLink
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Emily Kathryn Devan
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
HCL America, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer L. Dering
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Jerrold S. Kulback
Archer & Greiner
contact info
Creditor
Grapevine-Colleyville ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Thomas P Gove
296 Chelmsford Street, 2nd Floor East Gate Plaza
Chelmsford, MA 01824
Interested Party
Ernst & Young LLP
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher R. Belmonte
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP
contact info
Pamela A. Bosswick
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP
contact info
Interested Party
One Two Holding LLC
Represented By
Sherry Lowe Johnson
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Interested Party
Town of Monongah
Interested Party
PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP
Interested Party
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Sandeep Qusba
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Marisa A. Terranova
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Nicholas Baker
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Lender Group
Represented By
Gregory W. Werkheiser
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Prepetition Lenders
Represented By
Gregory W. Werkheiser
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Brian Kinney
Millbank Tweed Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Mark Shinderman
Milbank Tweed Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Gerard Uzzi
Milbank Tweed Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Interested Party
KPMG LLP
Interested Party
12%/14% Senior Subordinated Ad Hoc Group of Noteholders
Represented By
Ashley R. Beane
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Michael S. Stamer
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer Feld LLP
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
John Henry Schanne, II
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Sarah Link Schultz
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Communication Workers of America ("CWA")
Represented By
Thomas N. Ciantra
Cohen, Weiss And Simon LLP
contact info
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Marisa A. Terranova
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Nicholas Baker
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
Other Prof.
Morrison & Foerster LLP
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019
Other Prof.
Moelis & Company LLC
Other Prof.
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Timothy Jay Fox, Jr.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


1. Dex Media emerges from Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (law360.com)
Submitted Wed 08/03/2016
2. Dex Media, SuperMedia file for bankruptcy again (reuters.com)
Submitted Tue 05/17/2016
3. Dex Media Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 05/31/2016
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/22 1:18 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51026 Closed (AJL)
Related: [-]