Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11200

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:16-bk-11210
Case Filed:May 16, 2016
Terminated:Dec 22, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SuperMedia Inc.
PO Box 619810
2200 West Airfield Drive
Dfw Airport, TX 75261-9810
Represented By
Pauline K. Morgan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Thursday, December 22, 2016
6 6 order Final Decree Thu 12/22 1:37 PM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 12/22/2016 (SH)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/22 1:48 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 06/22 11:22 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by SuperMedia Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 06/22 11:19 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by SuperMedia Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 05/18 10:23 AM
Order (I)Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II)Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Dex Media, Inc., Case NO 16-11200 Dex Media East, Inc., Case No 16-11201 Dex Media Holdings, Inc., Case No. 16-11202 Dex Media Service LLC, Case No. 16-11203 Dex Media West, Inc., Case No 16-11204 Dex One Digital, Inc., Case No. 16-11205 Dex One Service, Inc., Case No. 16-11206 R.H. Donnelley APIL, Inc., Case No. 16-11207 R.H. Donnelley Corporation, Case No. 16-11208 R.H. Donnelley Inc., Case No. 16-11209 SuperMedia Inc., Case No. 16-11210 SuperMedia LLC, Case No. 16-11211 and SuperMedia Sales Inc., Case No. 16-11212 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 16-11200 (KG). Order Signed on 5/18/2016 (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
court Case Assigned Tue 05/17 9:07 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 05/16 10:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11210 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8018190, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 05/16 10:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by SuperMedia Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline)
Related: [-]