Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-30406

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Randall L Dunn
Case #: 3:16-ap-03061
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:May 16, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
SeaPort Airlines, Inc.
816 SW First Avenue
Portland, OR 97204
Represented By
SeaPort Airlines, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wings Airlines Services Inc
Represented By
JAMES JOSEPH SHEEHAN
Simpson, Tillinghast, Sorensen & Sheehan, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Monday, June 13, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/13 3:07 PM
Adversary Case 3:16-ap-3061 Closed (cmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 06/10 3:51 PM
Notice of Dismissal as to: SeaPort Airlines, Inc. Filed By Plaintiff Wings Airlines Services Inc (SHEEHAN, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
3 3 court Summons Issued (or Alias) Tue 05/17 3:01 PM
Summons Issued for service on SeaPort Airlines, Inc. Date Issued 5/17/2016, Answer Due 6/16/2016 Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 07/25/2016 at 10:00 AM in/by Telephone Hearing. (bd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 05/16 3:24 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 16-03061 rld] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A14286374. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/16 3:22 PM
Adversary case 16-03061 Complaint by Wings Airlines Services Inc against SeaPort Airlines, Inc.. $350 Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit: ,(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury))(SHEEHAN, JAMES) Modified on 5/17/2016 (bd) Corrected plaintiff record and nature of suit.
Related: [-]