Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Trish M Brown
Case #: 3:16-bk-30406
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Oct 25, 2016
Claims Deadline:Jan 23, 2017
Converted:Sep 20, 2016
Terminated:Aug 18, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SeaPort Airlines, Inc.
7505 NE Airport Way
Portland, OR 97218-1021
Represented By
ROBERT J VANDEN BOS
contact info
CHRISTOPHER N COYLE
contact info
ROBERT E COHN
Special Counsel
contact info
NELSON D ATKIN, II
Special Counsel
contact info
ROBERT L. RICHMOND
Richmond & Quinn
contact info
DOUGLAS R RICKS
contact info
JAMES M. DORAN
Special Counsel
contact info
Last checked: never
Cred. Comm. Chair
JA Flight Services, LLC
43W700 US Route 30
Sugar Grove, IL 60554
Represented By
BRIAN A JENNINGS
Perkins Coie
contact info
DOUGLAS R PAHL
contact info
Creditor Committee
Olson Brooksby, PC
200 Pacific Building 520 SW Yamhill St
Portland, OR 97204
Represented By
BRIAN A JENNINGS
Perkins Coie
contact info
DOUGLAS R PAHL
contact info
Creditor Committee
Memphis Propeller Service, Inc.
11098 Willow Ridge Drive
Olive Branch, MS 38654
Represented By
BRIAN A JENNINGS
Perkins Coie
contact info
DOUGLAS R PAHL
contact info
Trustee
Stephen P Arnot
POB 1963
Lake Oswego, OR 97035
Represented By
DAVID A FORAKER
contact info
STEVEN L. GRAFF
contact info
STEPHEN P ARNOT
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
620 SW Main St #213
Portland, OR 97205
Represented By
CARLA GOWEN MCCLURG
Doj-Ust
contact info
KATHYRN EVANS PERKINS
Doj-Ust
contact info


1. SeaPort Airlines files for Chapter 11 reorganization (peninsuladailynews.com)
Submitted Mon 02/08/2016
Docket last updated: 09/19/2016 5:00 PM PDT
Friday, February 05, 2016
1 1 10 pgs caseupld Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload Fri 02/05 6:59 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717. ROBERT J VANDEN BOS on behalf of SeaPort Airlines, Inc.. Exclusivity Period Expires 6/6/2016. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 02/05 7:02 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - case upload([LINK 16-30406 11] ) [caseupld,volp11u] (1717.00). Receipt Number A13962551. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 02/05 7:06 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed By Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Designation/2015 Rpts Fri 02/05 8:15 AM
Order of Designation, and Notice of Chapter 11 Financial Reporting and Mailing Requirements Rule 2015 Financial Report due by 3/21/2016. (bd)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 02/05 8:45 AM
Expedited Motion for Authority to Pay Prepetition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Health Insurance Premiums, And Workers' Compensation Insurance Premiums and Other Employee Expenses - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 02/05 8:49 AM
Expedited Motion for an Order Authorizing Payment or Honoring of Prepetition Obligations to Ticket Holders, Travel Agents and Interline Sales Partners and Obligations for Bank Charges Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 02/05 8:52 AM
Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement with Gravity Payments, Inc. Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 02/05 8:55 AM
Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement With American Express Company Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 02/05 8:58 AM
Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management Systems and for Continued Use of Certain Existing Bank Accounts - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Employ [LBF #1114 - 11/30/09 may apply] Fri 02/05 9:00 AM
Application to Employ Vanden Bos & Chapman, LLP Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order and Notice Re: Time to File Documents Fri 02/05 9:44 AM
Order and Notice Regarding Time to File Documents; and Notice of Proposed Dismissal. (bd)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/05 10:06 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed By Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. Re:5 Expedited Motion for Authority to Pay Prepetition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Health Insurance Premiums, And Workers' Compensation Insurance Premiums and Other Employee Expenses - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),6 Expedited Motion for an Order Authorizing Payment or Honoring of Prepetition Obligations to Ticket Holders, Travel Agents and Interline Sales Partners and Obligations for Bank Charges Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),7 Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement with Gravity Payments, Inc. Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),8 Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement With American Express Company Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),9 Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management Systems and for Continued Use of Certain Existing Bank Accounts - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT). Hearing Scheduled for 2/5/2016 at 11:00 AM in/by Telephone Hearing. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Expedite Hearing Fri 02/05 10:23 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. Re:5 Expedited Motion for Authority to Pay Prepetition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Health Insurance Premiums, And Workers' Compensation Insurance Premiums and Other Employee Expenses - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT) filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc.,6 Expedited Motion for an Order Authorizing Payment or Honoring of Prepetition Obligations to Ticket Holders, Travel Agents and Interline Sales Partners and Obligations for Bank Charges Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT) filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc.,7 Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement with Gravity Payments, Inc. Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT) filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc.,8 Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement With American Express Company Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT) filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc.,9 Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management Systems and for Continued Use of Certain Existing Bank Accounts - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT) filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 02/05 11:01 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed By Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Declaration Fri 02/05 11:22 AM
Declaration of Timothy F. Sieber Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc Modified on 2/5/2016 (bd)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance/Representation Fri 02/05 11:56 AM
Notice of Appearance/Representation Filed By U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Portland (PERKINS, KATHYRN)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/05 1:29 PM
Certificate of Service5 Miscellaneous Motion,6 Miscellaneous Motion,7 Miscellaneous Motion,8 Miscellaneous Motion,9 Miscellaneous Motion Filed By Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Notice of Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11/12 Fri 02/05 2:35 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines. Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Portland. 341(a) Meeting to be Held on 3/15/2016 at 10:00 AM at UST1, US Trustee's Office, Portland, Rm 223. Proofs of Claims due by 6/13/2016. (^US Trustee8, Portland)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Held) Fri 02/05 3:43 PM
Hearing Held. Re:5 Expedited Motion for Authority to Pay Prepetition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Health Insurance Premiums, And Workers' Compensation Insurance Premiums and Other Employee Expenses - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),6 Expedited Motion for an Order Authorizing Payment or Honoring of Prepetition Obligations to Ticket Holders, Travel Agents and Interline Sales Partners and Obligations for Bank Charges Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),7 Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement with Gravity Payments, Inc. Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),8 Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement With American Express Company Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT),9 Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management Systems and for Continued Use of Certain Existing Bank Accounts - Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT). (gjd)
Related: [-]
20 20 court Notice of Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11/12 Fri 02/05 3:58 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines. 341(a) Meeting to be Held on 3/15/2016 at 10:00 AM at UST1, US Trustee's Office, Portland, Rm 223. Proofs of Claims due by 6/13/2016. (bd)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Amended Petition Fri 02/05 4:21 PM
Amended Petition. Amended as to fdba Wings of Alaska. Amends1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - case upload Filed By Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (VANDEN BOS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Generic Motion Fri 02/05 4:53 PM
Order Authorizing5 Debtor to Pay Prepetition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Health Insurance Premiums, And Workers' Compensation Insurance Premiums and Other Employee Expenses filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines Inc (bd)
Related: [-]
23 23 court Notice to Serve Documents Fri 02/05 4:55 PM
Notice to Serve Documents Re:22 Order Authorizing5 Debtor to Pay Prepetition Payroll, Payroll Taxes, Employee Health Insurance Premiums, And Workers' Compensation Insurance Premiums and Other Employee Expenses filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines Inc (bd)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Notice of Appearance/Representation Fri 02/05 5:12 PM
Notice of Appearance/Representation Filed By Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (RICKS, DOUGLAS)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Generic Motion Fri 02/05 5:16 PM
Interim Order Re:6 Motion for an Order Authorizing Payment or Honoring of Prepetition Obligations to Ticket Holders, Travel Agents and Interline Sales Partners and Obligations for Bank Charges filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc; Final Hearing 3/9/2016 at 1:30 PM Courtroom No. 3 (bd)
Related: [-]
26 26 court Notice to Serve Documents Fri 02/05 5:21 PM
Notice to Serve Documents Re:25 Interim Order Re:6 Motion for an Order Authorizing Payment or Honoring of Prepetition Obligations to Ticket Holders, Travel Agents and Interline Sales Partners and Obligations for Bank Charges filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc; Final Hearing 3/9/2016 at 1:30 PM Courtroom No. 3 (bd)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Generic Motion Fri 02/05 5:24 PM
Order Authorizing7 Debtor's to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement with Gravity Payments, Inc. Effective as of the Petition Date filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (bd)
Related: [-]
28 28 court Notice to Serve Documents Fri 02/05 5:26 PM
Notice to Serve Documents Re:27 Order Authorizing7 Debtor's to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement with Gravity Payments, Inc. Effective as of the Petition Date filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc (bd)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Generic Motion Fri 02/05 5:28 PM
Order Authorizing8 Debtor's to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement With American Express Company Effective as of the Petition Date filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (bd)
Related: [-]
30 30 court Notice to Serve Documents Fri 02/05 5:30 PM
Notice to Serve Documents Re:29 Order Authorizing8 Debtor's to Assume a Certain Credit Card Processing Agreement With American Express Company Effective as of the Petition Date filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (bd)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Generic Motion Fri 02/05 5:35 PM
Order Granting9 Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management Systems and for Continued Use of Certain Existing Bank Accounts filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines, Inc. (bd)
Related: [-]
32 32 court Notice to Serve Documents Fri 02/05 5:36 PM
Notice to Serve Documents Re:31 Order Granting9 Debtor's Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management Systems and for Continued Use of Certain Existing Bank Accounts filed by Debtor SeaPort Airlines Inc (bd)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Special Notice Request Fri 02/05 9:11 PM
Special Notice Request Filed By Creditor Avion Capital Corporation (FIELD, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]