Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-81004

Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 1:16-ap-08018
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2016
Terminated:Nov 07, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lake Charles Memorial Hospital
c/o Registered Agent Stockwell, Sievert Law Firm One Lakeside Plaza
Lake Charles, LA 70601
Represented By
Lake Charles Memorial Hospital
contact info
Plaintiff
Ted Brett Brunson
POB 12
Natchitoches, LA 71457
Represented By
John W. Luster
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, November 07, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 11/07 11:29 AM
Disposition of Adversary 16-8018 - Dismissed. (juan)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/07 11:30 AM
Adversary Case 16-8018 Closed. (juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/08 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Dismissing Case
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
9 9 order Dismissing Case - AP Wed 10/05 3:58 PM
Judgment of Dismissal ( Re:1 Adversary case 16-08018 Complaint to Recover Preferential Transfer of Assets by Ted Brett Brunson against Lake Charles Memorial Hospital). Filed on 10/5/2016 (mela)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 20, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 08/21 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Application to Approve Compromise
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
7 7 order Approve Compromise Thu 08/18 1:13 PM
Order Granting Related [+]. It is Ordered that this adversary proceeding be dismissed upon receipt of settlement funds. (mela)
Related: [-] 5 Joint Application to Approve Compromise filed by Plaintiff Ted Brett Brunson, Defendant Lake Charles Memorial Hospital
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: Wed 08/17 11:43 AM
Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. Application Approved; E-Order to be submitted. (kels)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Approve Compromise
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
6 6 notice Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing) Tue 07/26 1:23 PM
Notice of Hearing Served on Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by John W. Luster on behalf of Ted Brett Brunson Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Alexandria. (Luster, John)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Approve Compromise
5 5 motion Approve Compromise Tue 07/26 1:22 PM
Joint Application to Approve Compromise Related [+] Filed by John W. Luster on behalf of Ted Brett Brunson, Lake Charles Memorial Hospital (Luster, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/07 9:49 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by John W. Luster on behalf of Ted Brett Brunson (Luster, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/07 9:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on Lake Charles Memorial Hospital 6/7/2016 . (Luster, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 06/02 11:00 AM
Summons Issued on Lake Charles Memorial Hospital. Date Issued 6/2/2016, Answer Due 7/5/2016 (mela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (Fee) Wed 06/01 3:14 PM
Adversary case 16-08018 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint to Recover Preferential Transfer of Assets with Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet by Ted Brett Brunson (attorney John W. Luster) against Lake Charles Memorial Hospital. Fee Amount Due $350 (Luster, John)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket US Treasury Receipt Wed 06/01 3:20 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 16-08018 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Related [+]. Receipt Number 16631849, in the Amount of $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1