Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11385

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:16-bk-11386
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2016
Terminated:Dec 06, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cliffs Drilling Company
9 Greenway Plz Ste 2200
Houston, TX 77046-0931
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Monday, December 06, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 12/06 9:30 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
7 7 order Final Decree Fri 12/03 12:22 PM
Final Decree Closing The Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services. Signed on 12/1/2021 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
6 6 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 08/13 7:54 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-11386 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021 Filed by Cliffs Drilling Company. (Harvey, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
5 5 court Case Reassigned Thu 04/11 9:21 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2016
4 4 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Wed 06/08 9:32 AM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch E-F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Modified Schedule E/F for Cliffs Drilling Company Filed by Cliffs Drilling Company. (Harvey, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 06/07 1:37 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Hercules Offshore, Inc.; Cliffs Drilling Company; Cliffs Drilling Trinidad L.L.C.; FDT LLC; FDT Holdings LLC; Hercules Drilling Company, LLC; Hercules Offshore Services LLC; Hercules Offshore Liftboat Company LLC; HERO Holdings, Inc.; SD Drilling LLC; THE Offshore Drilling Company; THE Onshore Drilling Company; TODCO Americas Inc.; and TODCO International Inc.. The docket in Case No. 16-11385 KJC) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 6/7/2016 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 06/06 1:33 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11386 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8042875, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 06/06 12:50 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Cliffs Drilling Company . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Cliffs Drilling Company. (Dehney, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 06/06 8:01 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey)
Related: [-]