Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:16-bk-11385
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2016
Claims Deadline:Jul 12, 2016
Terminated:Jan 21, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Nov 15, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other

Debtor
Hercules Offshore, Inc.
9 Greenway Plz Ste 2200
Houston, TX 77046-0931
Represented By
Matthew B. Harvey
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Stephen M Baldini
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
John C. Murphy
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
David M. Zensky
Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP
contact info
David H Botter
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Eide
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Catherine N. Eisenhut
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Philip C. Dublin
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Harley Raff
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer Feld LLP
contact info
Jacqueline Yecies
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Eric D. Schwartz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Michael S. Stamer
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer Feld LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Mediator
Christopher S Sontchi
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Timothy Jay Fox, Jr.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
David L. Buchbinder
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Friday, January 21, 2022
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 01/21 9:42 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH)
Related: [-]