FDT LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11385
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11385
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-11388 |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
FDT Holdings LLC
9 Greenway Plz Ste 2200
Houston, TX 77046-0931 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 12/06 9:27 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC) |
||
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Final Decree Closing The Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services. Signed on 12/1/2021 (DMC) |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-11388 for the Quarter Ending: 06/30/2021 Filed by FDT LLC. (Harvey, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Withdrawal of Claim 182.51 . Filed by Harris County. (Dillman, John) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch E-F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Modified Schedule E/F Filed by FDT LLC. (Harvey, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Hercules Offshore, Inc.; Cliffs Drilling Company; Cliffs Drilling Trinidad L.L.C.; FDT LLC; FDT Holdings LLC; Hercules Drilling Company, LLC; Hercules Offshore Services LLC; Hercules Offshore Liftboat Company LLC; HERO Holdings, Inc.; SD Drilling LLC; THE Offshore Drilling Company; THE Onshore Drilling Company; TODCO Americas Inc.; and TODCO International Inc.. The docket in Case No. 16-11385 KJC) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 6/7/2016 (LMD) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 06/06 1:33 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11388 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8042875, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition FDT LLC . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by FDT Holdings LLC. (Dehney, Robert) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 06/06 8:01 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |