Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:16-bk-11409
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2016
Terminated:Mar 31, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Jul 14, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Seventy Seven Finance Inc.
777 N.W. 63rd Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73118
Represented By
Christopher Newcomb
Baker Botts LLP
contact info
Emanuel C. Grillo
Baker Botts LLP
contact info
Erin R Fay
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:00 PM EST
Accountant
Ernst & Young LLP
Represented By
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Attorney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
1201 North Market Street P.O. Box 1347
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Attorney
Baker Botts L.L.P.
Represented By
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor
McMullen County
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Frio Hospital District
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harrison County, Harrison CAD
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Lee B. Gordon
Mccreary,veselka,bragg & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jasper County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Johnson County
500 E. Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Gina D Shearer
Clark Hill Strasburger
contact info
Creditor
Shelby County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Sheryl L. Moreau
Missouri Department Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S Kerr Ave Rm 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
Represented By
Gretchen A. Crawford
Oklahoma County Treasurer
contact info
Creditor
Oklahoma Gas and Electric Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Pearsall ISD
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sheldon Independent School District
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Brown & Connery, LLP Attn: Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096
Represented By
Donald K. Ludman
Brown & Connery LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ector CAD
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Office of the Attorney General 21 S. 12th Street 3rd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Represented By
Chris Momjian
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Superior Silica Sands LLC
Represented By
Gregory G. Hesse
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Shannon E. Daily
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Creditor
Term Loan Agent and Term Loan Lender Group
Represented By
Michael J. Cohen
Jones Day
contact info
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Peter J. Keane
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Genna L. Ghaul
Jones Day
contact info
Scott J. Greenberg
Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP
contact info
Creditor
BlueMountain Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Mark Allen Broude
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Christopher Martin Winter
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Michael R. Lastowski
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Adam E. Malatesta
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By
Jason A. Starks
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
American Electric Power
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Alvarado ISD
500 E. Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of OpCo Noteholders
Represented By
Andrew Dean
contact info
Creditor
The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By
Thomas A. Pitta
Emmet Marvin & Martin, LLP
contact info
Edward P Zujkowski
contact info
Financial Advisor
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
112 South Tryon Street Tryon Plaza, Floor 17
Charlotte, NC 28284
Represented By
Matthew B. Harvey
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Peter Jr. Spuler
Interested Party
U.S. Energy Development Corporation
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By
Andrew M. Kramer
Otterboug, Steindler, Houston & Ros
contact info
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Horan
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Harold Plog
Interested Party
Mudrick Capital Management L.P.
Interested Party
Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Morton R. Branzburg
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Ross Kwasteniet
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Daniel T Donovan
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Melissa N. Koss
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Interested Party
BlueMountain Captial Management
Interested Party
Axar Capital Management
Represented By
Matthew Barr
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
David N. Griffiths
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Andrew Dean
contact info
John H. Knight
Richards Layton & Finger
contact info
Zachary I. Shapiro
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Amy Oden
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
281 281 court Standing Order/Transcripts Wed 07/19 12:59 PM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 7/19/2017 to 8/2/2017. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM)
Related: [-]