PTL Prop Solutions, L.L.C.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11409
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11409
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-11416 |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
PTL Prop Solutions, L.L.C.
777 NW 63rd St
Oklahoma City, OK 73116-7601 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Final Claims Register . Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 03/31 11:39 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Final Decree (I) Closing the Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Terminating Certain Claims and Noticing Services. Signed on 3/30/2017 (NAB) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of Seventy Seven Finance Inc.; Seventy Seven Energy Inc.; Seventy Seven Operating LLC; Great Plains Oilfield Rental, L.L.C.; Seventy Seven Land Company LLC; Nomac Drilling, L.L.C.; Performance Technologies, L.L.C.; PTL Prop Solutions, L.L.C.; SSE Leasing LLC; Keystone Rock & Excavation, L.L.C.; and Western Wisconsin Sand Company, LLC. The docket in Case No. 16-11409 (LSS) Should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 6/8/2016. (NAB) Signed on 6/8/2016 (NAB) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 06/07 12:26 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11416 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8045334, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by PTL Prop Solutions, L.L.C.. (Dehney, Robert) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 06/07 12:35 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. (AK) |