Original Case: 2:12-cv-00928

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-01779
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2017 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Haas & Najarian
Represented By
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel & Masyr, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Haas & Najarian, LLP
Represented By
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel & Masyr, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee-Cross-Appellant
Haas & Najarian
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel & Masyr, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee-Cross-Appellant
Haas & Najarian, LLP
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel & Masyr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Abcon Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Charles Hamburger
Hamburger, Maxson, Yaffe & McNally, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross-Appellee
Abcon Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Charles Hamburger
Hamburger, Maxson, Yaffe & McNally, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/15/2017 4:29 AM EDT
Friday, June 03, 2016
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Abcon Associates, Inc., FILED. [1787172] 16-1779 [Entered: 06/06/2016 04:02 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/29/2016, RECEIVED.[1787208] 16-1779 [Entered: 06/06/2016 04:13 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/04/2016, RECEIVED.[1787210] 16-1779 [Entered: 06/06/2016 04:15 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Abcon Associates, Inc., district court receipt # 20348 , FILED.[1787214] 16-1779 [Entered: 06/06/2016 04:15 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1787218] 16-1779 [Entered: 06/06/2016 04:17 PM]
Related: [-]