Renee Palakovic, et al v. John Wetzel, et al
Original Case: 3:14-cv-00145
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02726 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 17, 2017 4:30 AM EDT |
Amicus Appellant
JEFFREY L. METZNER, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SERGEANT ROBERT REED
|
|
Defendant
SERGEANT KUSHNER
|
|
Defendant
SERGEANT DOUS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
FRANCIS PIROZZOLA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SERGEANT DOUS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER KUSHNER
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
HEARING EXAMINER ROBERT REED
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DR. CAROL EIDSVOOG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MHM INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MORRIS HOUSER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHELLE HOUSER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DR. DALEEP RATHORE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DR. JAMES HARRINGTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMEY LUTHER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMIE BOYLES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KENNETH CAMERON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN E. WETZEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RENEE PALAKOVIC, as Administrator of the Estate of Brandon Palakovic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DARIAN PALAKOVIC, as Administrator of the Estate of Brandon Palakovic
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 14 2017
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SMITH, JORDAN and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 54. Judge: SMITH Authoring. |
1. | Federal appeals court allows family of inmate who committed suicide to proceed with lawsuit (post-gazette.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/17/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2017 4:30 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Darian Palakovic and Renee Palakovic in District Court No. 3-14-cv-00145. (CJG) |