Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Kim R Gibson
Case #: 3:14-cv-00145
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2014
Re-opened:May 08, 2017
Terminated:Mar 31, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 2:35 AM EDT
Defendant
JAMIE BOYLES
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
KENNETH CAMERON
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
DR. RATHORE
Represented By
Cassidy L. Neal
Mats Baum O'Connor P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JAMES HARRINGTON
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
MICHELLE HOUSER
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
MORRIS HOUSER
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE #1,#2
Defendant
JOHN DOES #3-6
Defendant
JAMEY LUTHER
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
MHM, INC.
Represented By
Cassidy L. Neal
Mats Baum O'Connor P.C.
contact info
Defendant
FRANCIS PIROZZOLA
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
JOHN WETZEL
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yana L. Warshafsky
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
DARIAN PALAKOVIC
Represented By
Bret Grote
Abolitionist Law Center
contact info
Plaintiff
RENEE PALAKOVIC
Represented By
Michael J. Healey
Healey & Hornack, P.C.
contact info
Bret Grote
Abolitionist Law Center
contact info

GPO Jun 26 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. It is further Ordered that Plaintiffs are granted 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/26/2015. (dlg)
GPO Feb 22 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24, 32, and 39 Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/22/2016. (dlg)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
171 171 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/31 2:10 PM
ORDER re:170 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Plaintiff hereby notifies this Court that this case shall be dismissed with prejudice concerning matters contained and set forth in Plaintiffs' Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/31/2021. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
170 170 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Tue 03/30 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DARIAN PALAKOVIC, RENEE PALAKOVIC (Grote, Bret)
Related: [-]