O' Bryant v. World Management Inc.
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Noelle C Collins |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00836 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2016 3:25 AM CST |
Defendant
World Management Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth O' Bryant
1557 Salerno Dr.
St. Louis, MO 63133 |
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth O'Bryant
1557 Salerno Dr.
St. Louis, MO 63133 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Tue 10/31 1:25 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/31/17. (KJS) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 10/31 1:27 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 26. Tue Oct 31 13:27:18 CDT 2017 (Shirley, Kelley) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
3
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Tue 07/18 4:17 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet along with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cause service of process to be effected upon the Defendant no later than September 22, 2017. Failure to properly serve Defendant or otherwise move this Court to direct the U.S. Marshal to serve process by this date may result in the dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on July 18, 2017. (BRP) |
|
misc
Remark
Tue 07/18 4:27 PM
***REMARK: Docket sheet and Memorandum and Order mailed to Plaintiff this date. (BRP) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 07/11 2:58 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth O'Bryant USCA # 17-1561 Dismissed...In accordance with the judgment of July 11, 2017, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. (NEB) |
|
23 | 23
appeal
USCA JUDGMENT
Tue 07/11 2:57 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth O'Bryant... Appellant has not responded to the court's order entered June 19, 2017. It is hereby ordered that this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. (NEB) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 05/24 4:18 PM
ORDER of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth O'Bryant Regarding: filing fee USCA Appeal #: 17-1561 .. Appellants motion for extension of time to file filing fee is granted in part. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court by June 13, 2017. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by this date, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (NEB) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 05/01 4:14 PM
ORDER of USCA Regarding: Appeal Fee USCA Appeal #: 17-1561 .. The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by May 30, 2017, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (NEB) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 04/27 4:25 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc.15 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on April 27, 2017. (BRP) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 04/27 4:25 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 20. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Thu Apr 27 16:25:41 CDT 2017 (Porter, Brittany) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Memorandum & Order
Tue 04/11 3:31 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than April 21, 2017, Plaintiff shall submit a fully-completed Form CJA 23 (Financial Affidavit). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts Form CJA 23 (Financial Affidavit). (A copy of this order and the CJA23 mailed to plaintiff.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 04/11/2017. (KCB) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 03/15 4:27 PM
ORDER of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth O'Bryant USCA Appeal #: 17-1561 (NEB) |
|
17 | 17
appeal
Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA
Wed 03/15 4:17 PM
Initial Notification from USCA for14 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth O'Bryant USCA Appeal Number: 17-1561 Notice of Appeal forwarded to panel: Yes(NEB) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
Mon 03/13 9:50 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding13 Memorandum & Order. Notice of Appeal filed on 12/27/16 by Plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(BAK) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 12/27 2:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant. (KCB) |
|
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 12/27 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant. (KCB) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 12/08 3:33 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (Doc.11 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 12/08/2016. (KCB) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 12/08 3:33 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 13. Thu Dec 8 15:33:35 CST 2016 (Battle, Kinica) |
||
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Return Letter from Clerk
Fri 12/02 1:51 PM
RETURN LETTER from clerk to Kenneth O'Bryant re: Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (KCB) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 12/02 11:43 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant. (KCB) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance
Thu 11/10 11:21 AM
Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (cc: Plaintiff) (KCB) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance
Thu 10/27 1:20 PM
Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (KCB) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 10/27 1:20 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Thu Oct 27 13:20:58 CDT 2016 (Battle, Kinica) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 10/21 3:43 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Docket No.2 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall cause service of process to be effected upon the defendant no later than Thursday, January 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on October 21, 2016. (BRP) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 10/21 3:43 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Fri Oct 21 15:43:49 CDT 2016 (Porter, Brittany) |
||
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Receipt
Sun 10/09 7:38 PM
Receipt 4644060095 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Kenneth OBryant (CCAM) |
||
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Tue 09/13 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall either pay the statutory filing fee or submit a fully-completed CJA Form 23 (financial affidavit). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice and without further notice to him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 09/13/2016. (KCB) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 09/13 3:48 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Tue Sep 13 15:48:36 CDT 2016 (Battle, Kinica) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
Fri 09/02 3:55 PM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Kenneth O' Bryant. (NEB) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 08/08 11:20 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall either pay the statutory filing fee or submit a fully-completed CJA Form 23 (financial affidavit). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this case without prejudice and without further notice to him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/8/16. (KXS) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 08/08 11:20 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. copy mailed to plaintiff Mon Aug 8 11:20:17 CDT 2016 (Spurgeon, Katherine) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 07/07 2:06 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Thu Jul 7 14:06:08 CDT 2016 (Battle, Kinica) |
||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 06/13 10:41 AM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form[LINK:(moed-0041.pdf)] consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Mon 06/13 10:41 AM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Mon 06/13 11:01 AM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jun 13 11:01:11 CDT 2016 (admin,) |
||
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Mon 06/13 6:26 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
||
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
Mon 06/13 10:39 AM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Kenneth O' Bryant. (BAK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/13 10:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth O' Bryant. (BAK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/13 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant World Management Inc. Jury Demand,, filed by Kenneth O' Bryant.(BAK) |
|
Att: 1 MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form |