Jeager v. Genesis Healthcare
Montana District Court | |
Judge: | Sam E Haddon |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00030 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2016 2:20 AM MST |
Defendant
John Doe LLC's
|
|
Defendant
John Doe, Inc.'s 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Amber Dayhuff
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peak Medical Montana Operations
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Powell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dana Waddell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Jaeger
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Genesis Healthcare
Terminated: 07/28/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 12/15 11:53 AM
Remark. Disposal of hard copies of documents for removed case DV 16-00156 (CEH) |