Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11802

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:16-ap-01087
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2016
Terminated:Mar 15, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Grant Thornton UK LLP
Represented By
Grant Thornton UK LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aramid Distribution Trust
Represented By
Jordan W. Siev
Reed Smith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/15 11:37 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1087 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2017
41 41 19 pgs misc Transcript Wed 11/15 3:38 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/13/16 at 3:16 PM RE: Status conference re: Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (doc. #13). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/1/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/13/2017. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/4/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/1/2018. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, December 22, 2016
40 40 order Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/22 5:31 PM
Order Signed On 12/22/2016, Re: Concerning Defendant Grant Thornton UK LLPS Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And Improper Venue, Related [+]. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
39 39 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 12/07 6:38 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-] 38
38 38 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 12/07 6:26 PM
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Status Conference filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. with hearing to be held on 12/13/2016 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
36 36 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 11/29 4:33 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Christopher Neil Gray on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Gray, Christopher)
Related: [-] 35
35 35 misc Letter Tue 11/29 4:08 PM
Letter to the Honorable Sean H. Lane in Response to Defendant's November 28, 2016 Letter to the Court Filed by Christopher Neil Gray on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Gray, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2016
34 34 misc Letter Mon 11/28 4:32 PM
Letter to Hon. Sean H. Lane in Response to Plaintiff's November 23, 2016 letter to the Court Filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
33 33 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 11/23 4:29 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Christopher Neil Gray on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Gray, Christopher)
Related: [-] 32
32 32 misc Letter Wed 11/23 4:05 PM
Letter to the Hon. Sean H. Lane Filed by Christopher Neil Gray on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Gray, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2016
37 37 95 pgs misc Transcript Thu 12/01 2:39 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/16/16 at 10:32 AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference; Doc. #13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/16/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/28/2016. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 12/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/19/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/16/2017. (Cales, Humberto)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, November 04, 2016
31 31 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 11/04 6:54 PM
Affidavit of Service of Reply Memorandum of Law, Buck Supplemental Declaration, Jones Supplemental Declaraton and Welsby Declaration in Further Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Related [+] Filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 27 ,28 ,29 ,30
30 30 ans Declaration Fri 11/04 4:54 PM
Declaration of Roy Welsby in Further Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion To Dismiss Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 27 ,28 ,29 ,13
29 29 ans Declaration Fri 11/04 4:51 PM
Declaration / Supplemental Declaration of Simon Jones in Further Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion To Dismiss Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 27 ,28 ,13
28 28 ans Declaration Fri 11/04 4:48 PM
Declaration / Supplemental Declaration of Terry A. Back in Further Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion To Dismiss Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 27 ,13
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Engagement Letter
27 27 25 pgs ans Memorandum of Law Fri 11/04 4:33 PM
Memorandum of Law / Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, October 14, 2016
26 26 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/14 9:03 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-] 25 ,24
25 25 ans Declaration Fri 10/14 7:40 PM
Declaration of Jordan W. Siev in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-] 24
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Att: 13 Exhibit M
24 24 30+ pgs answer Memorandum of Law Fri 10/14 7:33 PM
Memorandum of Law /Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, October 07, 2016
23 23 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/07 1:12 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing on Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Related [+] Filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 10/07 12:56 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing on Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 10/14/2016, (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 17 ,13 ,16 ,15 ,12 ,14
Thursday, October 06, 2016
21 21 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 10/06 2:55 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/6/2016, Extending Deadline To File Opposition And Reply To The Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And Improper Venue. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
20 20 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 09/22 5:30 PM
So Ordered Stipulation And Order Signed On 9/22/2016, With Pre-Trial Conference To Be Held On 10/19/2016 At 10:00 AM At Courtroom 701 (SHL). (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2016
19 19 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 09/12 4:04 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion, Motion, Memorandum of Law and Declarations in Support of Dismissal for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Related [+] Filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 17 ,13 ,16 ,15 ,12 ,14
Friday, September 09, 2016
18 18 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/09 6:40 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers for Bruce R. Braun. filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-]
17 17 ans Declaration Fri 09/09 4:06 PM
Declaration of Simon Jones in Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 13 ,16 ,15 ,12 ,14
16 16 ans Declaration Fri 09/09 4:04 PM
Declaration of James Sayers in Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 13 ,15 ,12 ,14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Claim Form Issued by the English Commercial Court
15 15 ans Declaration Fri 09/09 3:59 PM
Declaration of Terry A. Back in Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 13 ,12 ,14
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Engagement Letter
14 14 30+ pgs ans Memorandum of Law Fri 09/09 3:54 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 13 ,12
13 13 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/09 3:49 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Related [+] filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 09/09 3:45 PM
Notice of Hearing on Grant Thornton UK LLP's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
11 11 answer Statement Tue 09/06 9:54 PM
Statement REPORT OF PARTIES' RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Christopher Neil Gray on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Gray, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2016
10 10 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/22 2:26 PM
Order Signed On 7/22/2016, Granting Application For Pro Hac Vice Re: Bruce R. Braun. Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
9 9 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Tue 07/19 2:46 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Bruce R. Braun filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 07/19 2:48 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 16-01087 shl) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11386006. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #9
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
8 8 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 07/06 4:26 PM
So Ordered Stipulation And Order Signed On 7/6/2016, Extending Time To Answer To September 9, 2016, With Pre-Trial Conference To Be Held On September 13, 2016 at 11:00 AM. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/05 3:54 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Dana Ashley Jupiter on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Jupiter, Dana)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 07/05 3:51 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement for Grant Thornton UK LLP . Filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/05 3:36 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Gazeena Kaur Soni on behalf of Grant Thornton UK LLP. (Soni, Gazeena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
4 4 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 06/22 8:31 PM
Affidavit of Service of Catherine Johnson of Reed Smith LLP Related [+] Filed by Jordan W. Siev on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Siev, Jordan)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 06/22 8:29 PM
Affidavit of Service of Catherine Johnson of Reed Smith LLP Related [+] Filed by Jordan W. Siev on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Siev, Jordan)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 06/15 11:40 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/13/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL), Answer due by 7/15/2016, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 06/13 5:12 PM
Adversary case 16-01087 Complaint against Grant Thornton UK LLP (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Jordan W. Siev on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (Siev, Jordan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 06/13 5:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01087 shl) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11332415. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1