Original Case: 2:12-cv-00928

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-01851
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2017 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Haas & Najarian
Represented By
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Haas & Najarian, LLP
Represented By
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Abcon Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Charles Hamburger
Hamburger, Maxson, Yaffe & McNally, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/15/2017 4:29 AM EDT
Friday, June 10, 2016
1 1 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Haas & Najarian and Haas & Najarian, LLP in 16-1851 FILED. [1791574] 16-1851 16-1779 [Entered: 06/13/2016 10:02 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/04/2016, RECEIVED.[1791581] 16-1851 16-1779 [Entered: 06/13/2016 10:08 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/29/2016, RECEIVED.[1791583] 16-1851 16-1779 [Entered: 06/13/2016 10:11 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Haas & Najarian and Haas & Najarian, LLP in 16-1851 district court receipt # 0207-8675366, FILED.[1791585] 16-1851 16-1779 [Entered: 06/13/2016 10:12 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1791587] 16-1851 16-1779 [Entered: 06/13/2016 10:13 AM]
Related: [-]