Original Case: 3:15-cv-00660

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-55845
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2016
Terminated:Aug 28, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Aug 30, 2018 1:33 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
SEAWORLD ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By
Lawrence Y. Iser
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP
contact info
Rebecca E. Bazan
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
contact info
Michelle C. Pardo
Fulbright & Jaworski LLP
contact info
John Morgan Simpson
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
contact info
Kristen Louise Spanier
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP
contact info
Gregory S. Gabriel
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HOLLY HALL
Represented By
Shayne Christopher Stevenson
Hagens Berman
contact info
Robert F. Lopez
Hagens Berman
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PAUL DANNER
Represented By
Shayne Christopher Stevenson
Hagens Berman
contact info
Robert F. Lopez
Hagens Berman
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VALERIE SIMO
Represented By
Shayne Christopher Stevenson
Hagens Berman
contact info
Robert F. Lopez
Hagens Berman
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOYCE KUHL
Represented By
Shayne Christopher Stevenson
Hagens Berman
contact info
Robert F. Lopez
Hagens Berman
contact info
Paul S. Rothstein
Attorney Paul S. Rothstein
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ELAINE BROWNE, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Shayne Christopher Stevenson
Hagens Berman
contact info
Robert F. Lopez
Hagens Berman
contact info
Paul S. Rothstein
Attorney Paul S. Rothstein
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/30/2018 1:32 AM PDT
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/21/2016. Transcript ordered by 07/11/2016. Transcript due 08/09/2016. Appellants Elaine Browne, Paul Danner, Holly Hall, Joyce Kuhl and Valerie Simo opening brief due 09/19/2016. Appellee Seaworld Entertainment, Inc. answering brief due 10/19/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10014576] (RT) [Entered: 06/14/2016 02:37 PM]
Related: [-]