California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: Ruben B Brooks
Case #: 3:15-cv-00660
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2015
Terminated:May 13, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 1:16 PM PDT
Defendant
Seaworld Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Michelle Ciszak Pardo
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
John M. Simpson
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Gregory S. Gabriel
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP
contact info
Kristen Spanier
Kinsella, Weitzman, Iser, Kump & Aldisert, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Yale Iser
Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Holly Hall
Represented By
Shayne Stevenson
contact info
Paul Rothstein
contact info
Stuart Cooper Yoes
Yoes Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro, LLP
contact info
David P Hall
Law Office Of David P. Hall
contact info
P. Rodney Jackson
Law Offices Of P. Rodney Jackson
contact info
Robert Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Lee M Gordon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro
contact info
William Stuart Calwell, Jr.
The Calwell Practice
contact info
David H. Carriger
The Calwell Practice
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sopol Shapiro
contact info
Plaintiff
Elaine Browne
Represented By
Shayne Stevenson
contact info
Paul Rothstein
contact info
Stuart Cooper Yoes
Yoes Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro, LLP
contact info
David P Hall
Law Office Of David P. Hall
contact info
P. Rodney Jackson
Law Offices Of P. Rodney Jackson
contact info
Robert Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Lee M Gordon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro
contact info
William Stuart Calwell, Jr.
The Calwell Practice
contact info
David H. Carriger
The Calwell Practice
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sopol Shapiro
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Danner
Represented By
Shayne Stevenson
contact info
Paul Rothstein
contact info
Stuart Cooper Yoes
Yoes Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro, LLP
contact info
David P Hall
Law Office Of David P. Hall
contact info
P. Rodney Jackson
Law Offices Of P. Rodney Jackson
contact info
Robert Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Lee M Gordon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro
contact info
William Stuart Calwell, Jr.
The Calwell Practice
contact info
David H. Carriger
The Calwell Practice
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sopol Shapiro
contact info
Plaintiff
Joyce Kuhl
Represented By
Shayne Stevenson
contact info
Paul Rothstein
contact info
Stuart Cooper Yoes
Yoes Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro, LLP
contact info
David P Hall
Law Office Of David P. Hall
contact info
P. Rodney Jackson
Law Offices Of P. Rodney Jackson
contact info
Robert Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Lee M Gordon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro
contact info
William Stuart Calwell, Jr.
The Calwell Practice
contact info
David H. Carriger
The Calwell Practice
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sopol Shapiro
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Simo
Represented By
Shayne Stevenson
contact info
Paul Rothstein
contact info
Stuart Cooper Yoes
Yoes Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro, LLP
contact info
David P Hall
Law Office Of David P. Hall
contact info
P. Rodney Jackson
Law Offices Of P. Rodney Jackson
contact info
Robert Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Lee M Gordon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro
contact info
William Stuart Calwell, Jr.
The Calwell Practice
contact info
David H. Carriger
The Calwell Practice
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sopol Shapiro
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Roci Bollmann
Terminated: 08/21/2015
Represented By
Shayne Stevenson
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro, LLP
contact info
Robert Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Lee M Gordon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sopol Shapiro
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Gaab
Terminated: 08/21/2015
Represented By
Shayne Stevenson
contact info
Elaine T. Byszewski
Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro, LLP
contact info
Robert Lopez
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Lee M Gordon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sopol Shapiro
contact info


1. SeaWorld deceives customers about whales, federal lawsuit alleges (orlandosentinel.com)
Submitted Thu 03/26/2015
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
83 83 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 09/19 9:10 AM
MANDATE of USCA affirming the decision of the USDC as to73 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit, filed by Valerie Simo, Holly Hall, Joyce Kuhl, Elaine Browne, Paul Danner. (akr)
Related: [-]