Original Case: 1:15-cv-00965

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-02782
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2016
Terminated:Aug 08, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 07, 2016 9:53 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
DOLARTODAY LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Elizabeth C. Hall
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Ricardo Gonzalez
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Gregory E. Stuhlman
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Jay A. Yagoda
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Brigid F. Cech Samole
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GUSTAVO DIAZ VIVAS, an Alabama Resident
Represented By
Elizabeth C. Hall
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Gregory E. Stuhlman
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Jay A. Yagoda
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Brigid F. Cech Samole
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
IVAN DARIO LOZADA-SALAS, a Washington Resident
Represented By
Elizabeth C. Hall
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Gregory E. Stuhlman
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Jay A. Yagoda
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Brigid F. Cech Samole
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSE ENRIQUE ALTUVE LOZADA, a Florida Resident
Represented By
Elizabeth C. Hall
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Gregory E. Stuhlman
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Jay A. Yagoda
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Brigid F. Cech Samole
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BANCO CENTRAL DE VENEZUELA, a Venezuelan Government Organization
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Thomas C. Grimm
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Robert J. Katzenstein
Smith Katzenstein & Jenkins
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/07/2016 9:53 AM EDT
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Banco Central de Venezuela in District Court No. 1-15-cv-00965. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Order 051116
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 4 1 pgs Standing Order
Att: 5 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Banco Central de Venezuela advising this court that no transcripts are available. (RJK)
Related: [-]