Banco Central de Venezuela v. DolarToday, LLC et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory M Sleet |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00965 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 20, 2016 5:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jose Enrique Altuve Lozada
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gustavo Diaz Vivas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DolarToday, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ivan Dario Lozada-Salas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Banco Central de Venezuela
|
Represented By
|
1. | Venezuela, Black-Market Currency News Site Square Off in U.S. Court (wsj.com) |
Submitted Fri 12/18/2015 | |
2. | Venezuela sues currency website over claims of cyberterrorism (theguardian.com) |
Submitted Fri 10/23/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
64 | 64
![]() USCA Order Terminating Appeal as to60 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Banco Central de Venezuela. USCA Decision: Dismissing Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42b. (pb, ) |