The Adoni Group, Inc. v. Irun Handbag Co, Ltd
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01103 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Irun Handbag Co, Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Adoni Group, Inc.
475 Park Avenue South 18th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/17 9:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1103 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 05/14 1:37 PM
Notice of Dismissal /Notice of Discontinuance of Action filed by Teresa Sadutto-Carley on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Sadutto-Carley, Teresa) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, February 28, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Sun 02/28 10:31 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Robert E. Grossman to Judge Lisa G. Beckerman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 06/29 5:17 PM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Irun Handbag Co, Ltd Answer Due: 7/29/2016. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 06/16 4:10 PM
Adversary case 16-01103 Complaint against Irun Handbag Co, Ltd (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 06/16 4:11 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01103 mkv) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11337946. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |