The Adoni Group, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:14-bk-11841 |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 08, 2014 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 20, 2016 |
Converted: | Jun 27, 2014 |
Dismissed: | Jan 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2019 |
Debtor
The Adoni Group, Inc.
247 W 38th St Fl 3
New York, NY 10018-0242 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Dakota International Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Sky Vision Industrial Company Limited
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Global Sky International Enterprise Limited
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Baud Sports (H.K.) Industrial Limited
|
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Dongguan Guanhai Shoes Company Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Represented By
|
1. | New York Shoe Brand Modern Vice Up for Sale (blogs.wsj.com) |
Submitted Sat 12/13/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/17 9:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1103 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/17 10:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1112 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/10 9:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:14-ap-2437 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/10 9:52 AM
Adversary Case 1:14-ap-2438 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/10 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:14-ap-2439 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/10 9:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:14-ap-2440 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |