The Adoni Group, Inc. v. Tong chia, ltd
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01105 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tong chia, ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Adoni Group, Inc.
475 Park Avenue South 18th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 10/05 2:51 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1105 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Nulty, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Wed 10/04 3:37 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Teresa Sadutto-Carley on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Sadutto-Carley, Teresa) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 06/29 5:20 PM
Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Tong chia, ltd Answer Due: 7/29/2016. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 06/16 4:24 PM
Adversary case 16-01105 Complaint against Tong chia, ltd (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 06/16 4:25 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01105 mkv) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11338006. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |