The Adoni Group, Inc. v. Pacific Cascade Distribution, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11841
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01116 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Pacific Cascade Distribution, Inc.
5002 D Street NW Suite 106
Auburn, WA 98001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Adoni Group, Inc.
475 Park Avenue South 18th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/28 3:18 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1116 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Nulty, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Motion, Approve Compromise
Wed 07/26 3:32 PM
Order Signed on 7/26/2017 Approving Stipulation. (Nulty, Lynda) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Motion, Approve Compromise
Fri 04/21 1:17 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Andrew S. Muller on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc. with hearing to be held on 5/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV) Responses due by 5/17/2017,. (Muller, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Tue 01/10 4:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Pre-Trial Conference filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 10/18 4:09 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Scott L. Swanson on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Swanson, Scott) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 10/17 1:18 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Scott L. Swanson on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Swanson, Scott) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 08/29 3:17 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Scott L. Swanson on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Swanson, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/09 12:04 PM
Stipulation of Adjournment Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/07 1:55 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thu 06/23 4:43 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 7/25/2016, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 06/16 4:59 PM
Adversary case 16-01116 Complaint against Pacific Cascade Distribution, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of The Adoni Group, Inc.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 06/16 5:00 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01116 mkv) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11338195. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |