Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-13575

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas B Donovan
Case #: 2:16-ap-01276
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2016
Terminated:Dec 09, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
SJ 10177 LLC
Represented By
SJ 10177 LLC
contact info
Defendant
LUCY GAO aka XIANGXIN GAO
Represented By
LUCY GAO aka XIANGXIN GAO
contact info
Defendant
LIBERTY CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By
LIBERTY CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
contact info
Defendant
LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By
LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
contact info
Defendant
NORTH AMERICAN CAPITAL LLC
Represented By
NORTH AMERICAN CAPITAL LLC
contact info
Defendant
NORTH AMERICA ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By
NORTH AMERICA ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
contact info
Defendant
NORTH AMERICA ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By
NORTH AMERICA ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC
contact info
Defendant
SUNSHINE VALLEY LLC
Represented By
SUNSHINE VALLEY LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELSV, LLC
Represented By
ELSV, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, December 09, 2016
32 32 court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/09 3:15 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-1276 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Pennington-Jones, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 10/21 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
30 30 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Wed 10/19 3:24 PM
Order denying motion for attorney's fees and costs on remand and granting relief from the automatic stay (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/19/2016 (Pennington-Jones, Patricia)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, October 17, 2016
29 29 misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 10/17 5:07 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Denying Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand and Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION Related [+]. (Karasik, Eve)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand # 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand # 3 Declaration of Laura Palazzolo in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand) filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
28 28 answer Reply Wed 10/05 2:34 PM
Reply to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC,27 Opposition filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
27 27 answer Opposition Wed 09/28 5:27 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Opposition To Motion For Attorney's Fees And Costs On Remand Filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (Kwong, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 through 6
Att: 2 Exhibit 7 through 9
Att: 3 Exhibit 10 through 12 with POS
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 09/14 2:57 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 10/12/2016 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1345 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Thomas B. Donovan (Pennington-Jones, Patricia)
Related: [-] 24 Generic Motion filed by ELSV, LLC
Thursday, September 08, 2016
26 26 misc Proof of service Thu 09/08 4:43 PM
Proof of service of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC Related [+]. (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand
25 25 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 09/08 4:26 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order re Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC Related [+]. (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand # 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand # 3 Declaration of Laura Palazzolo in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand) filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
24 24 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Wed 09/07 10:45 PM
Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand
Att: 2 5 pgs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand
Att: 3 Declaration of Laura Palazzolo in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs on Remand
Monday, August 29, 2016
23 23 misc Transmittal Mon 08/29 1:35 PM
Transmittal of Certified Copy of the Order Remanding Removed Action.21 . (Ly, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2016
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 08/26 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/26/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion For Remand (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
21 21 order Remand (BNC-PDF) Wed 08/24 10:57 AM
Order Granting Motion to Remand to State Court (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/24/2016 (Pennington-Jones, Patricia)
Related: [-] 2
Friday, August 12, 2016
20 20 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 08/12 11:38 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC. (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
19 19 answer Reply Wed 08/10 4:25 PM
Reply to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-] 17 Opposition filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Declaration of Steven Tsang
Att: 3 Declaration of Ralph J. Swanson
Att: 4 Exhibit 1
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 part 1
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 part 2
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 part 3
Att: 8 Exhibit 2 part 4
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
18 18 misc Status report Wed 08/03 5:53 PM
Status report (Unilateral) Filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION Related [+]. (Kwong, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
17 17 answer Opposition Wed 08/03 4:59 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Debtor's: (1) Opposition To Motion To Remand To State Court; And (2) Response To Order To Show Cause Re: Remand And Notice Of Status Conference; Declaration Of Benjamin Kirk In Support Thereof Filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (Kwong, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC,7 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)moved Proceeding
16 16 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 08/03 4:15 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Karasik, Eve. (Karasik, Eve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 07/28 9:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
14 14 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 07/26 1:56 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Fritz, John-Patrick. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 07/26 10:44 AM
Order Granting Stipulation and ORDER thereon to conitinue hearing on motion to remand to state court HEARING CONTINUED from 8/3/16 to 8/17/16 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1345 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/26/2016 (Vandensteen, Nancy)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 07/26 9:49 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Golubchik, David. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 07/15 3:05 PM
Stipulation By LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION and ELSV, LLC to Continue Hearing on Motion to Remand to State Court Filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (Kwong, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 07/08 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/08/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, July 07, 2016
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 07/07 11:33 AM
Proof of service Of Order To Show Cause Re: Remand Related [+] And Notice Of Status Conference Filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (Kwong, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] moved Proceeding7 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)
court Hearing Set (Motion) Thu 07/07 12:29 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 08/03/2016 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1345 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Thomas B. Donovan (Pennington-Jones, Patricia)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Remand filed by ELSV, LLC
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
8 8 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 07/06 5:33 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Meadows, David. (Meadows, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 order OSC to appear and show cause (BNC-PDF) Wed 07/06 2:53 PM
Order to show cause re: Remand Related [+] and Notice of Status Conf. set for Aug 17, 2016 at 11:00 am. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 7/6/2016 (Toliver, Wanda)
Related: [-] moved Proceeding1
court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 07/06 2:59 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 08/17/2016 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1345 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Thomas B. Donovan (Toliver, Wanda)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)
Friday, July 01, 2016
6 6 motion Remand (motion) Fri 07/01 11:59 AM
Motion for Remand to State Court Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proof of service Fri 07/01 10:37 AM
Proof of service - Proof of Service of: Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. § 1452(a) - Filed by Defendant LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (Kwong, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
4 4 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 06/28 3:57 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order re Motion for Remand to State Court Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC Related [+]. (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Remand to State Court; Statement that Removed Action is Not a Core Proceeding; Request for Mandatory Abstention Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ralph J. Swanson # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC
3 3 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 06/28 3:07 PM
Notice of motion/application for Remand to State Court Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC Related [+]. (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Remand to State Court; Statement that Removed Action is Not a Core Proceeding; Request for Mandatory Abstention Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ralph J. Swanson # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC
2 2 motion Remand (motion) Tue 06/28 3:01 PM
Motion for Remand to State Court; Statement that Removed Action is Not a Core Proceeding; Request for Mandatory Abstention Filed by Plaintiff ELSV, LLC (Palazzolo, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ralph J. Swanson
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, June 17, 2016
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 06/17 12:00 PM
Adversary case 2:16-ap-01276. Notice of Removal Notice Of Removal Of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. § 1452(A) by ELSV, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Kwong, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 06/17 2:37 PM
Receipt of Notice of Removal(2:16-ap-01276-TD) [cmp,ntcrmvl] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 42716481. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1