California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:16-bk-13575
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Apr 25, 2016
Terminated:Feb 23, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Jun 18, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Liberty Asset Management Corporation
2648 E. Workman Avenue #3001-263
West Covina, CA 91791
Represented By
Robert S Lawrence
Callahan & Blaine Aplc
contact info
Jeffrey S Kwong
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
Raphael Cung
Callahan & Blaine Aplc
contact info
Sandford Frey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl
contact info
John-Patrick M Fritz
Levene Neale Bender Yoo Et Al
contact info
Sandford L. Frey
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, Inc.
contact info
David B Golubchik
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
Eve H Karasik
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 10:24 AM PST
Accountant
SLBiggs
10960 Wilshire Boulevard 7th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90024
Attorney
Scott Whitman
Scott L. Whitman, Inc. 5670 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 2170
Los Angeles, CA 90036
Represented By
Scott L Whitman
Scott L Whitman Inc
contact info
Attorney
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
10100 Santa Monica Blvd., 13th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Jeremy V Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Attorney
David W. Meadows
Law Offices David W. Meadows 1801 Century Park East Ste 1235 Ste 1235
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
David W. Meadows
contact info
Attorney
David Trinh
Trinh Law 99 N 1st St, Ste 200
San Jose, CA 95113
Broker
Keller Williams Santa Monica/Pacific Palisades
Creditor
Wan-Ting Liu
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
HT 2011 REO Management LLC
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
Heusing Holdings LLC
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
Shanghai Commercial Bank
5670 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 2170
Los Angeles, CA 90036
Represented By
Scott L Whitman
Scott L Whitman Inc
contact info
Creditor
Huesing Holdings LLC
Represented By
Kyra E Andrassy
Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jean Hung
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
JD Brothers LLC
Represented By
Charles Alex Naegele
C. Alex Naegele, A Professional Law Corp
contact info
Creditor
Lee Walgreens 2013 LLC
Represented By
James S Yan
contact info
Creditor
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P.
10250 Constellation Blvd. Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
David B Golubchik
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
Creditor
HCL 2011 LLC
Represented By
James S Yan
contact info
Creditor
Wen-Che Liu
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
Los Angeles County Treasurer & Tax Collector
Steckbauer Weinhart, LLP c/o Barry S. Glaser 333 S. Hope Street, Ste. 3600
Los Angeles, CA 90071
Represented By
Oscar Estrada
contact info
Barry S Glaser
Steckbauer Weinhart
contact info
Creditor
Maxwell Real Estate Investment, LLC et al.
1609 W. Garvey Ave. North
West Covina, CA 91790
Represented By
Julie A Esposito
Law Offices Of Stephen E Ensberg
contact info
Creditor
Nixon Peabody LLP
Represented By
Patricia H Lyon
French Lyon Tang
contact info
Creditor
Northern California Mortgage Fund VII, LLC
101 Lucas Valley Road
San Rafael, CA 94903
Represented By
Mark Romeo
contact info
Creditor
PA One, LLC
Represented By
James S Yan
contact info
Creditor
Richbest Holding, LLC
Represented By
James Andrew Hinds, Jr
contact info
Creditor
Remy Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
Chiu-Mei Chen
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
YCJS 2012 LLC
Represented By
David S Henshaw
Henshaw Law Office
contact info
Creditor
Washe LLC
Represented By
James Andrew Hinds, Jr
contact info
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
ASM Capital V, L.P.
7600 Jericho Turnpike, Suite 302
Woodbury, NY 11797
Represented By
Douglas Wolfe
Asm Capital
contact info
Creditor
ASM SPV, L.P.
7600 Jericho Turnpike, Suite 302
Woodbury, NY 11797
Represented By
Douglas Wolfe
Asm Capital
contact info
Creditor
Union Square 117 Project LLC
Represented By
James S Yan
contact info
Creditor
Brook Parker LLC
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Mastr Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2007-2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-2
1770 Fourth Avenue
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Kelly M Raftery
contact info
Creditor
Minyu Jessica Chang
Represented By
James Andrew Hinds, Jr
contact info
Creditor
Yu-Fang Liu Chen
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
Chin-I Tu
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
TT Investment Los Angeles Fund I, LLC, a California limited liability company
Futter-Wells, PC 2463 Ashland Avenue
Santa Monica, CA 90405
Represented By
Cynthia Futter
Futter-Wells PC
contact info
Creditor
ELSV, LLC
Represented By
Laura Palazzolo
Berliner Cohen
contact info
Creditor
George Eshoo
Represented By
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor
Faith Hope International Ltd.
Represented By
James S Yan
contact info
Creditor
Smart Gear Development Ltd.
Represented By
James S Yan
contact info
Creditor
Good Special International Ltd.
Represented By
James S Yan
contact info
Creditor
Great Vista Real Estate Investment Corporation
Represented By
James Andrew Hinds, Jr
contact info
Daniel J McCarthy
Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims
Represented By
Robert M Saunders
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
John D Fiero
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Victoria Newmark
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jeremy V Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Gail S Greenwood
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
John D Fiero
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jeremy V Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Gail S Greenwood
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Jeremy V Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Gail S Greenwood
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims, Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims
Represented By
Robert M Saunders
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
John D Fiero
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Victoria Newmark
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jeremy V Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Gail S Greenwood
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Benjamin Kirk
2648 E Workman Ave #3001-263
West Covina, CA 91791
Represented By
Steven R Skirvin
Law Offices Of William E. Crockett
contact info
Derrick Talerico
Zolkin Talerico LLP
contact info
William Crockett
contact info
Interested Party
Frank Lee
1871 The Alameda Suite 333
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
David S Henshaw
Henshaw Law Office
contact info
Interested Party
Shelby Ho a/k/a Tsai Luan Ho
126 Atherton Ave
Atherton, CA 94027
Represented By
James Andrew Hinds, Jr
contact info
Interested Party
Lucy Gao
Represented By
Alexandre I Cornelius
contact info
Stephen R Wade
The Law Offices Of Stephen R Wade
contact info
Interested Party
Crystal Waterfalls LLC
1211 E. Garvey Sreet
Covina, CA 91724
Represented By
Ian Landsberg
Landsberg Law, Apc
contact info
Interested Party
Courtesy NEF
Represented By
James R Felton
contact info
David W. Meadows
contact info
Paul R Shankman
Hinds & Shankman, LLP
contact info
Barry S Glaser
Steckbauer Weinhart
contact info
Uzzi O Raanan, ESQ
Danning, Gill, Diamond & Kollitz, LLP
contact info
Timothy J Silverman
Scheer Law Group, LLP
contact info
Rachel M Sposato
Hinds & Shankman LLP
contact info
Robert S Lawrence
Callahan & Blaine Aplc
contact info
Sara Chenetz
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Lee Costell
contact info
Lei Lei Wang Ekvall
Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP
contact info
Kelly M Raftery
contact info
Robert D Bass
Greenberg & Bass LLP
contact info
James Andrew Hinds, Jr
contact info
Kyra E Andrassy
Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP
contact info
John H Choi
contact info
Interested Party
Board of Directors of Liberty Asset Management Corporation
Represented By
Derrick Talerico
Zolkin Talerico LLP
contact info
Other Professional
Lawrence R Perkins
Other Professional
Bradley D. Sharp
Represented By
Michael Stein
Tisdale And Nicholson LLP
contact info
Jeremy V Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Gail S Greenwood
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Mitchell B Ludwig
contact info
Other Professional
SierraConstellation Partners, LLC
Represented By
David B Golubchik
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
Realtor
COLDWELL BANKER
Respondent
Sonia Chiou
Represented By
David A Trinh
Trinh Law Apc
contact info
Respondent
Alfred E Valladares
10246 Newville Ave
Downey, CA 90241
Special Counsel
TISDALE & NICHOLSON LLP, a California Limited Liability Partnership
Represented By
Linda Kim
Tisdale & Nicholson LLP
contact info
Michael Stein
Tisdale And Nicholson LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Queenie K Ng
contact info
Hatty K Yip
Office Of The Ust/doj
contact info
Kelly L Morrison
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info

GPO Jan 07 2019
Memorandum Of Decision Denying Objections To Proofs Of Claim (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 152 Signed on 1/7/2019 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)

Docket last updated: 46 seconds ago
Monday, April 17, 2023
980 980 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report (UST Form 11-PCR) Mon 04/17 1:33 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2023 Filed by Other Professional Bradley D. Sharp. (Gray, Erin)
Related: [-]