Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:16-ap-51014
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2016
Terminated:Dec 06, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
TSA STORES, INC.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
TSA STORES, INC.
contact info
Defendant
Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By
Bank Of America, N.A.
contact info
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
contact info
Defendant
WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
Represented By
WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB
contact info
Defendant
Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.
Represented By
Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.
contact info
Defendant
OOCL (USA) Inc.
Represented By
OOCL (USA) Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
O2Cool, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
168 North Clinton Street, Suite 500
Chicago, IL 60661
Represented By
Ayesha Bennett
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info
Jason M. Torf
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info
Ayesha Chacko Bennett
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
115 115 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/12 3:05 PM
Order Approving the Stipulation of Dismissal. Related [+] Order Signed on 12/12/2017. (GM)
Related: [-] 113
Monday, December 11, 2017
114 114 notice Docketing - Notice Mon 12/11 11:43 AM
(COPY FROM DISTRICT COURT OF STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF APPEAL) BAP 17-37 So Ordered 12/6/2017 by District Court Judge Andrews. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2017
113 113 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 12/08 4:34 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation of Dismissal Related [+] Filed by O2Cool, LLC. (Hurford, Mark)
Related: [-] 112
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/06 8:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51014 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
112 112 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/05 3:02 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by O2Cool, LLC. (Hurford, Mark)
Related: [-]