Original Case: 0:15-cv-60334

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-prici-14144
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2016
Last checked: Friday Jul 01, 2016 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
RAYMOND JAMES & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By
G. Calvin Hayes
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Samuel Wayne Braver
Buchanan Ingersoll
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JYLL BRINK, on her own behalf, and on behalf of those similarly situated
Represented By
Eric Mathew Sodhi
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Sara Elizabeth Hanley
Law Offices of Place and Hanley PLLC
contact info
Joshua Lee Spoont
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Lyle E. Shapiro
Herskowitz Shapiro, PLLC
contact info
Randall Charles Place
Law Offices of Place and Hanley PLLC
contact info
Darren Craig Blum
Blum Law Group
contact info

GPO Jun 08 2018
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Jyll Brink. Decision: Reversed and Remanded. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.

Docket last updated: 07/01/2016 4:33 AM EDT
Monday, June 27, 2016
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jyll Brink on 06/24/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 07/18/2016 as to Appellant Jyll Brink
Related: [-]