Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Lurana S Snow
Case #: 0:15-cv-60334
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2015
Re-opened:Jul 09, 2018
Terminated:Oct 25, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 9:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By
George Calvin Hayes
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney
contact info
Samuel Wayne Braver
Buchanan Ingersoll
contact info
Erin Kathleen Linehan
Raymond James Financial, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jyll Brink
Represented By
Randall Charles Place
Law Offices Of Place And Hanley PLLC
contact info
Darren Craig Blum
Blum Law Group
contact info
Sara Elizabeth Hanley
Law Offices Of Place , Hanley, LLC
contact info
Lyle Eric Shapiro
Richman Greer, P.A.
contact info
Eric Matthew Sodhi
Richman Greer, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Lee Spoont
Richman Greer, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 21, 2020
197 197 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 02/21 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Compliance re196 Order. Order sent to Ms. Schuette via US Mail. (scn)
Related: [-]
196 196 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 02/21 1:36 PM
ORDER OVERRULING NOTICE OF UNACCEPTABLE SETTLEMENT. Related [+] The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Ms. Schuette at the address below. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-] placing DE#195