Original Case: 1:15-cv-00045

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cvus-05188
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2016
Terminated:Aug 01, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 02, 2017 4:40 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Campaign for Accountability
Represented By
Anne Louise Weismann
Campaign for Accountability
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Represented By
Anne Louise Weismann
Campaign for Accountability
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Demand Progress
Represented By
Anne Louise Weismann
Campaign for Accountability
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
OpenTheGovernment.org
Represented By
Anne Louise Weismann
Campaign for Accountability
contact info
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Project on Government Oversight
Represented By
Anne Louise Weismann
Campaign for Accountability
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Financial Stability Oversight Council
Represented By
Nicolas Riley
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Daniel Tenny
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
DOJ Appellate Counsel
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Mark B. Stern
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Benjamin Charles Mizer
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Intervenor - Appellant
Better Markets, Inc.
Represented By
Austin Wesson King
Better Markets, Inc.
contact info
Stephen W. Hall
Better Markets, Inc.
contact info
Dennis Michael Kelleher
Better Markets, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MetLife, Inc.
Represented By
Amir Cameron Tayrani
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Indraneel Sur
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Eugene Scalia
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Ashley Stocks Boizelle
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 01 2017
OPINION [1686709] filed (Pages: 27) for the Court by Judge Garland. [16-5188]

Docket last updated: 08/02/2017 4:40 AM EDT
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 16-5188
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF APPEAL [1622115] filed by Better Markets, Inc. seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-00045-RMC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-5188 16-5188
Related: [-]
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1622166] filed by Dennis M. Kelleher and co-counsel Stephen W. Hall on behalf of Appellant Better Markets, Inc.. 16-5188 (Kelleher, Dennis)
Related: [-]
DOCKETING STATEMENT [1622167] filed by Better Markets, Inc. [Service Date: 06/28/2016 ] 16-5188 (Kelleher, Dennis)
Related: [-]