District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rosemary M Collyer
Case #: 1:15-cv-00045
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2015
Re-opened:May 16, 2018
Terminated:Mar 31, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jul 12, 2015 8:35 AM EDT
Amicus
AMICI ECONOMICS PROFESSORS
Represented By
Gregory Gerber Rapawy
Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Amicus
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS
Represented By
Steven A. Neeley, Jr.
Husch Blackwell, LLP
contact info
Defendant
FINANCIAL STABILITY OVERSIGHT COUNCIL
Represented By
Elisabeth Layton
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Deepthy Kishore
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Movant
BETTER MARKETS, INC.
Represented By
Dennis M. Kelleher
Better Markets, Inc.
contact info
Movant
PROFESSORS OF FINANCIAL REGULATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE LAW
Represented By
Kate E. Andrias
University Of Michigan Law School
contact info
Movant
SCHOLARS OF INSURANCE REGULATION
Represented By
Deepak Gupta
Gupta Beck PLLC
contact info
Movant
ACADEMIC EXPERTS IN FINANCIAL REGULATION
Represented By
William M. Jay
Goodwin Procter, LLP
contact info
Movant
AMERICAN COUNCIL OF LIFE INSURERS
Represented By
David William Ogden
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Movant
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Steven Gill Bradbury
Dechert LLP
contact info
Daniel Brett Kohlhofer
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Movant
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS
Represented By
Steven A. Neeley, Jr.
Husch Blackwell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
METLIFE, INC.
Represented By
Amir Cameron Tayrani
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Eugene Scalia
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Ashley Stocks Boizelle
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Indraneel Sur
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, L.L.P.
contact info

GPO Mar 30 2016
OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on March 30, 2016. (zcdw) Modified to unseal pursuant to MINUTE ORDER Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/7/2016 (zrdj).
GPO May 25 2016
OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/25/2016. (lcrmc3)
GPO Sep 18 2018
OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/18/2018. (lcrmc3) Modified on 9/27/2018 to correct document type. (zcdw).

1. Judge Rips 'Unreasonable' Decision on MetLife in Order (wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 04/08/2016
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
131 131 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Case Tue 09/18 11:18 AM
ORDER denying121 Better Markets' Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/18/2018. (lcrmc3)
Related: [-]
130 130 order .Order Tue 09/18 11:16 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/18/2018. (lcrmc3)
Related: [-]