Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:13-bk-10334
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2013
Dismissed:Dec 17, 2014
Terminated:Jan 05, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ormet Corporation
43840 State Route 7
Hannibal, OH 43931
Represented By
Daniel B. Butz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Kim Martin Lewis
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Emma F. Hand
contact info
Erin R Fay
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Tim J. Robinson
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Patrick D. Burns
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Dan Barnowski
Denton Us LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2013 11:11 AM EDT
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Daniel B. Butz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Erin R Fay
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


1. Bankruptcy judge clears way for sale of Ormet's Hannibal smelter (platts.com)
Submitted Tue 07/29/2014
2. Aluminum maker Ormet to sell closed Ohio smelter (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 10/18/2013
3. Ohio smelter faces shutdown without utility rate relief (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 10/05/2013
4. Ohio's PUCO approves Ormet power deal with some modifications (reuters.com)
Submitted Thu 10/03/2013
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 14, 2015
1586 1586 Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]