Member Case
Lead case is: 1:13-bk-10334

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:13-bk-10338
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2013
Dismissed:Dec 17, 2014
Terminated:Jan 05, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ormet Railroad Corporation
43840 State Route 7
Hannibal, OH 43931
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 02/26/2013 1:38 PM EST
Monday, February 25, 2013
1 1 19 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1213. Filed by Ormet Railroad Corporation. (Dehney, Robert)
Related: [-]