Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:14-bk-14794

Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Richard D Taylor
Case #: 2:16-ap-01064
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2016
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dale C. Bartlett
7102 Highway 1 S
Marvell, AR 72366
Represented By
Dale C. Bartlett
contact info
Plaintiff
Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC
408 Cole St.
Harrisburg, AR 72432
Represented By
Lyndsey D. Dilks
Dilks Law Firm
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
41 41 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/05 1:02 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-1064 Closed. (Bell, Allison)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 04, 2023
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/04 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Related Doc 38) Entered on Docket 11/2/2023 (Bell, Allison)
Thursday, November 02, 2023
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/02 10:13 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered on Docket 11/2/2023 (Bell, Allison)
Related: [-] 38
Friday, October 27, 2023
38 38 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/27 3:39 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Lyndsey D. Dilks on behalf of Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC (Dilks, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Wed 05/10 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/10/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Trial RESCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)) Trial scheduled for 11/28/2023 through 12/1/2023 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Monday, May 08, 2023
36 36 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Mon 05/08 12:29 PM
Trial RESCHEDULE Related [+] Trial scheduled for 11/28/2023 through 12/1/2023 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
35 35 court Hearing Not Held (Courtroom) Tue 04/11 1:10 PM
Hearing Not Held. CONTINUED, TO BE RESET BY SUBSEQUENT NOTICE. Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
34 34 court Hearing Not Held (Courtroom) Tue 04/11 1:10 PM
Hearing Not Held. CONTINUED, TO BE RESET BY SUBSEQUENT NOTICE. Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC
Thursday, October 27, 2022
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Fri 10/28 9:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/27/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Trial SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)) Trial scheduled for 5/1/2023 to 5/5/2023 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
32 32 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 10/25 11:54 AM
Trial SCHEDULE Related [+] Trial scheduled for 5/1/2023 to 5/5/2023 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)
Monday, February 07, 2022
31 31 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Mon 02/07 10:49 AM
Status Hearing Scheduled For 2/08/2022 Not Held. Settled Prior to the Hearing. Status update provided to the court by the parties. (No order due). Related [+] (Ellis, Taylor)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)
Thursday, January 27, 2022
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 01/27 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/27/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Status hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)) Hearing scheduled for 2/8/2022 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
29 29 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 01/25 10:21 AM
Status hearing SCHEDULE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/8/2022 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)
Thursday, May 14, 2020
28 28 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Thu 05/14 8:28 AM
Trial Scheduled For 6/5/2020 Not Held. TO BE RESET UPON SUBSEQUENT NOTICE Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) ,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)
Saturday, September 07, 2019
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sat 09/07 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Trial SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett) Hearing scheduled for 6/1/2020 through 6/5/2020 starting at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Thursday, September 05, 2019
26 26 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Thu 09/05 3:35 PM
Trial SCHEDULE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/1/2020 through 6/5/2020 starting at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
25 25 court Hearing Held (Courtroom) V3.4 Tue 07/23 2:34 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] Complaint - related document(s)1
Saturday, June 01, 2019
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sat 06/01 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Status hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2019 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Thursday, May 30, 2019
23 23 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Thu 05/30 8:38 AM
Status hearing SCHEDULE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2019 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC
Thursday, March 28, 2019
22 22 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Thu 03/28 1:03 PM
Hearing Scheduled For 4/11/2019 through 4/11/2019 Not Held. TO BE RESET UPON SUBSEQUENT NOTICE Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Saturday, January 05, 2019
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/05 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Granting Motion To Consolidate and Continue on Case 2:16-ap-1002 and 2:16-ap-1064 (Related Doc 17), Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On (Related Doc 17) (related documents Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 2:16-ap-01064 with 2 16-01002 Motion to Continue Hearing ) Entered on Docket 1/3/2019 (Schacherbauer, Linda)
Friday, January 04, 2019
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Fri 01/04 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Hearing CONTINUED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett) Hearing scheduled for 4/1/2019 through 4/11/2019 starting at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Thursday, January 03, 2019
19 19 order Consolidate Thu 01/03 10:41 AM
Order Granting Motion To Consolidate and Continue on Case 2:16-ap-1002 and 2:16-ap-1064 Related [+], Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On Entered on Docket 1/3/2019 (Schacherbauer, Linda)
Related: [-] 17 17 Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 2:16-ap-01064 with 2 16-01002 Motion to Continue Hearing
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
18 18 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Wed 01/02 1:10 PM
Hearing CONTINUE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/1/2019 through 4/11/2019 starting at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Friday, December 21, 2018
17 17 motion Consolidate Fri 12/21 2:13 PM
Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 2:16-ap-01064 with 2 16-01002 Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Lyndsey D. Dilks on behalf of Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC (Dilks, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Wed 08/08 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Trial RESCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett) Trial scheduled for 1/7/2019 through 1/11/2019 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Monday, August 06, 2018
15 15 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Mon 08/06 2:50 PM
Trial RESCHEDULE Related [+] Trial scheduled for 1/7/2019 through 1/11/2019 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
14 14 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Wed 07/25 10:43 AM
Trial Scheduled For 8/6/2018 Not Held. TO BE RESET UPON SUBSEQUENT NOTICE Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Thursday, May 03, 2018
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 05/03 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/03/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Trial RESCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett) Trial scheduled for 8/6/2018 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
12 12 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 05/01 9:57 AM
Trial RESCHEDULE Related [+] Trial scheduled for 8/6/2018 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
11 11 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Wed 04/04 1:45 PM
Hearing Scheduled For 4/11/2018 Not Held. TO BE RESET UPON SUBSEQUENT NOTIC Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Thursday, November 23, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 11/23 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Trial SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett) Hearing scheduled for 4/11/2018 to 4/13/2018 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
9 9 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 11/21 10:53 AM
Trial SCHEDULE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/11/2018 to 4/13/2018 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Monday, November 06, 2017
8 8 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Mon 11/06 1:31 PM
Trial Scheduled For 11/8/2017 Not Held. TO BE RESET UPON SUBSEQUENT NOTIC Related [+] (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Thursday, September 07, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 09/07 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Trial SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett) Trial scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom.
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
6 6 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 09/05 1:39 PM
Trial SCHEDULE Related [+] Trial scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Richard Taylor's Little Rock Courtroom. (Scales, Erika)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount (Attachments: # 1 AP Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F # 8 Exhibit G # 9 Exhibit H # 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J1 # 12 Exhibit J2 # 13 Exhibit J3 # 14 Exhibit J4 # 15 Exhibit J5 # 16 Exhibit J6 # 17 Exhibit J7 # 18 Exhibit J8 # 19 Exhibit J9 # 20 Exhibit J10 # 21 Exhibit J11 # 22 Exhibit 12 # 23 Exhibit J13 # 24 Exhibit J14 # 25 Exhibit J15 # 26 Exhibit J16 # 27 Exhibit K # 28 Exhibit L # 29 Exhibit M # 30 Exhibit N # 31 Exhibit O # 32 Exhibit P # 33 Exhibit Q # 34 Exhibit S # 35 Exhibit S # 36 Exhibit T) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Plaintiff Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC,5 Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.) filed by Defendant Dale C. Bartlett
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/03 5:26 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by J. Brad Moore on behalf of Defendant Dale C. Bartlett (Moore, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/06 12:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dale C. Bartlett (Dilks, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 06/30 5:34 PM
RECEIPT of Complaint(2:16-ap-01064) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. receipt number 11328503, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 06/30 5:31 PM
Summons Issued on Dale C. Bartlett Answer Due 08/1/2016 (Dilks, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp complaint - COURT USE ONLY Thu 06/30 5:31 PM
Adversary case 2:16-ap-01064. Complaint by Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC against Dale C. Bartlett. Fee Amount Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Dilks, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]