Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Richard D Taylor
Case #: 2:14-bk-14794
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jun 22, 2015
Claims Deadline:Sep 24, 2015
Converted:Apr 24, 2015
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 21, 2015

Debtor
Dale C. Bartlett
7102 Highway 1 S
Marvell, AR 72366-9107
Represented By
Frederick S. Wetzel
Frederick S. Wetzel, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
MidSouth Rice, LLC
PO Box 4135
Cleveland, MS 38732
Represented By
Nicholas Heath Wooten
Nick Wooten, LLC
contact info
Lyndsey D. Dilks
Lueken Dilks Law Firm
contact info
Creditor Committee
Zero Grade Farms
732 Isbell Road
England, AR 72046
Represented By
Donald K. Campbell, III
Arkansas Bankruptcy Associates, PLLC
contact info
Lyndsey D. Dilks
Lueken Dilks Law Firm
contact info
Nicholas Wooten
Nick Wooten, LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Helena National Bank
Represented By
Lyndsey D. Dilks
Lueken Dilks Law Firm
contact info
David B Vandergriff
Quattlebaum, Grooms &tull PLLC
contact info
Nicholas Wooten
Nick Wooten, LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Southern Rice & Cotton, LLC
PO Box 231
Harrisburg, AR 72432
Represented By
Lyndsey D. Dilks
Lueken Dilks Law Firm
contact info
Nicholas Wooten
Nick Wooten, LLC
contact info
Trustee
Renee Williams
Chapter 12 Standing Trustee 125 Roberts Ridge Terrace
Hot Springs, AR 71901
Represented By
Renee Williams
contact info
Trustee
A. Jan Thomas, Jr.
Chapter 7 Panel Trustee 306 West Bond Avenue
West Memphis, AR 72301
Trustee
Warren E. Dupwe
Chapter 7 Panel Trustee 300 W Jefferson
Jonesboro, AR 72401
Represented By
Warren E. Dupwe
Warren E. Dupwe, P.A.
contact info
Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Parker Hurst & Burnett PLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


1. Turner Grain's Dale Bartlett Asks for Chapter 7 (arkansasbusiness.com)
Submitted Mon 04/13/2015
Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 2:44 PM CDT
Friday, September 05, 2014
1 1 Chapter 12 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $275 Filed by Dale C. Bartlett. (Wetzel, Frederick)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Frederick S. Wetzel on behalf of Debtor Dale C. Bartlett (Wetzel, Frederick)
Related: [-]
3 3 RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)(2:14-bk-14794) [misc,volp12a] ( 275.00) Filing Fee. receipt number 10030212, amount $ 275.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
4 4 Amended Schedules/Statements Filed:Petition Page, [Fee Due No] Filed by Frederick S. Wetzel on behalf of Debtor Dale C. Bartlett (Wetzel, Frederick)
Related: [-]
5 5 I hereby certify that the Trustee, U.S. Trustee, creditors and any other entity affected thereby, have been noticed pursuant to Rule 1009(a) of the modification of the debtor(s) social security number and request that the social security number on file for the debtor(s) be modified. Note: Form B21 must be submitted within 48 hours to dropbox@areb.uscourts.gov. Upon receipt of Form B21 the social security number will be modified. filed by Frederick S. Wetzel Debtor Dale C. Bartlett. (Wetzel, Frederick)
Related: [-]