Honig v. American Express Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-24874
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-24874
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kathryn C Ferguson |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-01565 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
American Express Corporation
PO Box 981531
El Paso, TX 79998 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard B. Honig
Hellring Lindeman Goldstein & Siegal LLP One Gateway Center 8th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Case
Wed 12/21 4:15 PM
Adversary Case (3:16-ap-1565) Closed. (ghm) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadline
Wed 11/30 10:53 AM
Objection to Notice of Information Deadline Terminated, Reason: No Objections Filed (gan) |
||
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy
Wed 10/26 11:06 AM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Richard B. Honig, Chapter 7 Trustee (Trustee) for Cloudeeva, Inc. (Debtor) brought an action on a preference claim against American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services, Inc. (collectively, Amex), Adv. Pro. No. 16-1565 Amex asserted substantial defenses against the Trustees preference claim. The Trustee settled these issues between the parties based on the foregoing, difficulties of proof and the costs of litigation.. Hearing scheduled for 12/06/16 at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. Objections due by 11/29/16. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Saturday, October 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Tue 10/25 3:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/22/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
File Settlement Documents
Thu 10/20 9:42 AM
ORDER TO FILE SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/19/2016. Stipulation of Settlement Deadline is 11/21/2016. (bwj) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 10/18 4:54 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: SETTLED (ghm ) |
||
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
court
Determination of Adjournment Request
Mon 10/17 8:51 AM
Determination of Adjournment Request Denied. (ghm) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Document
Thu 09/15 3:28 PM
Document re: Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint filed by Gene M. Burd on behalf of American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. (Burd, Gene) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Rescheduled (Document)
Wed 09/14 3:58 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm ) |
||
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/07 4:49 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
court
Alias Summons Issued
Tue 08/16 5:10 PM
Alias Summons Issued to Richard B Honig, Trustee for service on American Express Company Answer due on 9/15/2016; American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc. Answer due on 9/15/2016 (wdr) |
|
utility
Add Party
Tue 08/16 4:58 PM
American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., Defendant, added to case (wdr) |
||
utility
Add Party
Tue 08/16 5:08 PM
American Express Company, Defendant, added to case (wdr) |
||
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/15 2:45 PM
Amended Complaint Filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. Reason for amendment: correct name of Defendant American Express to American Express Company and to add as Defendant American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Alias Summons | ||
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Document
Fri 08/05 10:31 AM
Document re: Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gene M. Burd on behalf of American Express Corporation. (Burd, Gene) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/05 10:29 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Gene M. Burd on behalf of American Express Corporation. (Burd, Gene) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/29 4:50 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 07/06 4:35 PM
Summons Issued to Richard Honig for Service on American Express Corporation Answer due on 8/5/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/13/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (wdr) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Attachments | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/06 11:09 AM
Adversary case 16-01565 Complaint by Richard B. Honig against American Express Corporation. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Wed 07/06 11:29 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 16-01565 KCF] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32357651, fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |